EP3854156 - BANDWIDTH PART EXTENSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.2023 [2023/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZIRWAS, Wolfgang Rohrsängerplatz 7 B 81249 Munich / DE | 02 /
ENESCU, Mihai Riistapolku 4 B 30 02120 Espoo / FI | 03 /
DALSGAARD, Lars Torpantie 56 90230 Oulu / FI | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2021/30] | Application number, filing date | 18934323.9 | 21.09.2018 | [2021/30] | WO2018FI50680 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020058562 | Date: | 26.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3854156 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 26.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04L5/00, H04W16/10, H04W24/10, H04B17/24, H04B17/309, H04L25/02, H04B7/0408, H04B7/06, H04W28/06, H04B7/024, // H04B7/02 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
H04L25/0212 (EP);
H04B17/373 (EP);
H04B7/0617 (EP);
H04L25/022 (EP);
H04L25/0232 (EP);
H04B17/327 (EP);
H04B17/336 (EP);
H04B7/024 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (EP);
H04W72/0453 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/30] | H04W72/04, H04L5/00, H04W16/10, H04W24/10, H04B17/24, H04B17/309, H04L25/02, H04B7/0408, H04B7/06, H04W28/06, H04B7/024 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Title | German: | BANDBREITENTEILERWEITERUNGEN | [2021/30] | English: | BANDWIDTH PART EXTENSIONS | [2021/30] | French: | EXTENSIONS DE PARTIES DE BANDE PASSANTE | [2021/30] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 21.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 29.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/18] | 20.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017353222 (WEI CHAO [CN], et al) [A] 1,6,10,13 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0068] *; | [A] - ZTE ET AL, "Remaining details on CSI reporting", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20171009 - 20171013, (20171003), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1717423 REMAINING DETAILS ON CSI REPORTING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_90b/Docs/, (20171003), XP051352641 [A] 1,6,10,13 * paragraph [0002] * | [A] - MOTOROLA, "CQI Feedback Schemes for E-UTRA", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-072178 CQISCHEME, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070502), vol. RAN WG1, no. Kobe, Japan; 20070502, XP050105920 [A] 1,6,10,13 * paragraph [0002] * | International search | [A]WO2016115654 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * par. [0001 ], [0006]-[0007], [0061]-[0066], figs. 7, 9-10B *; | [A]US2017126439 (YOSHIMOTO TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * par. [0012], [0022], [0117]-[0122], [0170], [0173], figs. 4, 7 *; | [A]CN107872891 (YULONG COMPUTER TELECOMMUNICATION SCIENTIFIC SHENZHEN CO LTD) [A] 1-21 * & machine translation into English by EPO [online] EPOQUENET TXPMTCEA par. [0006], [0054], [0064] *; | [A]US2018183551 (CHOU CHIE-MING [TW], et al) [A] 1-21 * par. [0002], [0060], [0063], [0070]-[0071], figs. 3-6 *; | [A] - "Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; NR; Physical layer procedures for data (Release 15", 3GPP TS 38.214, (20180629), URL: https://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Specs/2018-06/Rel-15/38_series/38214-f20.zip, (20190611), XP051454110 [A] 1-21 * , chapters 1, 5.1.2, 5.2 * |