EP3719516 - CHARGING DEVICE TEST SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2020/41] | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIAN, Chen No. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/41] | Application number, filing date | 18935202.4 | 30.09.2018 | [2020/41] | WO2018CN109087 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020062239 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3719516 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3719516 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/40, G01R31/28, G01R27/08, H02J7/00 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
G01R31/40 (EP);
H02J7/0029 (KR,US);
G01R31/00 (CN);
G01R31/42 (KR,US);
G01R27/08 (EP,CN);
G01R31/2827 (EP);
G01R31/36 (US);
H02J7/00034 (EP);
H02J7/0047 (KR);
H02J7/0031 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/41] | G01R31/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LADEGERÄTTESTSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2020/41] | English: | CHARGING DEVICE TEST SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2020/41] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TEST DE DISPOSITIF DE CHARGE | [2020/41] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2020 | Translation filed | 30.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 21.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.11.2022 | AT | 02.11.2022 | CZ | 02.11.2022 | DK | 02.11.2022 | EE | 02.11.2022 | ES | 02.11.2022 | FI | 02.11.2022 | HR | 02.11.2022 | IT | 02.11.2022 | LT | 02.11.2022 | LV | 02.11.2022 | MC | 02.11.2022 | NL | 02.11.2022 | PL | 02.11.2022 | RO | 02.11.2022 | RS | 02.11.2022 | SE | 02.11.2022 | SI | 02.11.2022 | SK | 02.11.2022 | SM | 02.11.2022 | NO | 02.02.2023 | GR | 03.02.2023 | IS | 02.03.2023 | PT | 02.03.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
IT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 02.11.2022 | |
NO | 02.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN1467507 (ALLEN TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]EP3142341 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD [CN]) [X] 1,10 * paragraph [0198] - paragraph [0223]; figures 1-10 *; | [XI]US2017179741 (TIAN CHEN [CN], et al) [X] 1-3,7-12 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0106]; figures 1-6 * * paragraphs [0241] - [0242] - [0252] * [I] 4-6,13-15; | [X]EP3276784 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD [CN]) [X] 1,6,10,11,15 * paragraph [0198] - paragraph [0234]; figures 1-23 * |