EP3840121 - ANTENNA AND TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUO, Xin Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Yi Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 18935303.0 | 26.09.2018 | [2021/25] | WO2018CN107779 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020061865 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3840121 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q3/44, H01Q19/24, H01Q19/26 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
H01Q3/44 (EP);
H01Q3/30 (CN);
H01Q3/36 (US);
H01Q1/22 (CN);
H01Q1/36 (CN);
H01Q1/50 (CN);
H01Q19/24 (EP,US);
H01Q19/26 (EP,US);
H01Q3/40 (US);
H01Q9/16 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/25] | H01Q3/30, H01Q21/29 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Title | German: | ANTENNE UND ENDGERÄT | [2021/25] | English: | ANTENNA AND TERMINAL | [2021/25] | French: | ANTENNE ET TERMINAL | [2021/25] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2021 | Translation filed | 17.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 04.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1030401 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,8,12,13 * paragraphs [0023] - [0032]; figures 1, 8-10, 13-15 * [I] 5; | [A]US2004032370 (ITO HIDEO [JP], et al) [A] 7,10* paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0061]; figures 3A, 3B, 6A, 6B *; | [XI]JP2004134873 (ATR ADVANCED TELECOMM RES INST) [X] 1-6,8,9,13 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 15] - paragraph [0050]; figures 1, 3, 6, 10-16 * [I] 7,10; | [XI]JP2005094367 (RICOH KK) [X] 1-4,6,8,11 * paragraph [0024]; figure 5 * [I] 12,13 |