EP3871527 - CONTROL UNIT, AEROSOL GENERATION DEVICE, METHOD AND PROGRAM FOR CONTROLLING HEATER, AND SMOKING ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1, Toranomon 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6927 / JP | [2021/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMADA, Manabu c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC., 17-7, Yokokawa 1-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | 02 /
TAKEUCHI, Manabu c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC., 17-7, Yokokawa 1-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | 03 /
INOUE, Yasunobu c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC., 17-7, Yokokawa 1-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | 04 /
SUMII, Tateki c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC., 17-7, Yokokawa 1-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | 05 /
UCHII, Kimitaka c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC., 17-7, Yokokawa 1-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/35] | Application number, filing date | 18937682.5 | 26.10.2018 | [2021/35] | WO2018JP39918 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020084775 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3871527 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A24F47/00 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
A24F40/57 (EP);
A24F40/50 (EP);
A24F40/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Title | German: | STEUEREINHEIT, AEROSOLERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM ZUR STEUERUNG DES HEIZAGGREGATS UND RAUCHARTIKEL | [2021/35] | English: | CONTROL UNIT, AEROSOL GENERATION DEVICE, METHOD AND PROGRAM FOR CONTROLLING HEATER, AND SMOKING ARTICLE | [2021/35] | French: | UNITÉ DE COMMANDE, DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME DE COMMANDE D'APPAREIL DE CHAUFFAGE ET ARTICLE POUR FUMEUR | [2021/35] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2021 | Translation filed | 16.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 16.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 14.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP23161447.0 / EP4212039 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2753203 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO CO [GB]) [Y] 3,4 * abstract ** paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0027] *; | [XYI]EP2770859 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [X] 1,2,5-7,13-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0077] * [Y] 3,4 [I] 8-12; | [XAI]EP2770860 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [X] 1,2,6-11,13-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0085] * [A] 3-5 [I] 12; | [Y]EP3062644 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO CO [GB]) [Y] 3,4 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0030] * | International search | [A]JP2014512207 [A] 1-16 * , *; | [Y]JP2014525251 [Y] 3-4 * , *; | [XY]JP2014530632 [X] 1-2, 5-16 * , * [Y] 3-4; | [Y]JP2016534730 [Y] 3-4 * , *; | [A]JP2017509339 [A] 1-16* , *; | [A]WO2018020599 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]) [A] 1-16 * , *; | [A]JP2018108100 (NICOVENTURES HOLDINGS LTD) [A] 1-16 * , * | by applicant | JP2017113016 | WO2018019786 |