Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020090052 | Global Dossier | 07.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018JP40592 | 31.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11826866 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2023 | B2 | US2021394321 | 23.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018JP40592 | 31.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7032560B | Global Dossier | 08.03.2022 | B2 | JPWO2020090052 | 02.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018JP40592 | 31.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112888530B | Global Dossier | 04.04.2023 | B | CN112888530 | 01.06.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018JP40592 | 31.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3875216 | Global Dossier | 15.06.2022 | A4 | EP3875216 | 08.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018JP40592 | 31.10.2018 |