EP3874822 - CONDITIONAL HANDOVERS AND CELL RE-SELECTIONS ALONG KNOWN ROUTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOVLEKAR, Srirang A. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 02 /
NIMMALA, Srinivasan One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 03 /
XU, Fangli Mail Stop 850-8RE, 25F, International Finance Centre, 8 Jianguomenwai Avenue Chaoyang District Beijing 100022 / CN | 04 /
CHEN, Yuqin Mail Stop 850-8RE, 25F, International Finance Centre, 8 Jianguomenwai Avenue Chaoyang District Beijing 100022 / CN | 05 /
XING, Longda One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 06 /
ZHANG, Dawei One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 07 /
SHIKARI, Murtaza A. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 08 /
GURUMOORTHY, Sethuraman One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 09 /
HU, Haijing Mail Stop 850-8RE, 25F, International Finance Centre, 8 Jianguomenwai Avenue Chaoyang District Beijing 100022 / CN | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 18938915.8 | 01.11.2018 | [2021/36] | WO2018CN113358 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020087432 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3874822 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/30 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
H04W36/0094 (EP,US);
H04W36/08 (EP,US);
H04W36/305 (US);
H04W36/362 (EP,US);
H04W36/00838 (EP,US);
H04W36/304 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Title | German: | BEDINGTE ÜBERGABEN UND ZELLENNEUAUSWAHLEN ENTLANG BEKANNTER ROUTEN | [2021/36] | English: | CONDITIONAL HANDOVERS AND CELL RE-SELECTIONS ALONG KNOWN ROUTES | [2021/36] | French: | TRANSFERTS INTERCELLULAIRES CONDITIONNELS ET RESÉLECTIONS DE CELLULES LE LONG DE ROUTES CONNUES | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 20.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 24.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2015195757 (TIETZ ROBERT [GB], et al); | [Y]US2015319668 (GUO XIN [CN]); | [Y]US2018035348 (AXMON JOAKIM [SE], et al); | [Y]WO2018143703 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |