EP3878203 - DATA BLOCK TRANSMISSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lenovo (Beijing) Limited 6 Shangdi West Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2021/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LING, Wei Shuangying West Road 78, 18-3-202 Changping Beijing 102299 / CN | 02 /
ZHU, Chenxi F2, Building B, No.6 Shang Di West Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Bingchao Room 501, Unit 8, Building 3 Lan Tian Yuan Huoying Street Changping District Beijing 102200 / CN | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2021/37] | Application number, filing date | 18939639.3 | 08.11.2018 | [2021/37] | WO2018CN114607 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020093320 | Date: | 14.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3878203 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/00, H04L27/00, H04L1/08, H04L1/18 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
H04L1/08 (EP);
H04L1/18 (US);
H04L1/1819 (EP);
H04L1/1887 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/37] | H04W28/00, H04L27/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] | Title | German: | DATENBLOCKÜBERTRAGUNGEN | [2021/37] | English: | DATA BLOCK TRANSMISSIONS | [2021/37] | French: | TRANSMISSIONS DE BLOCS DE DONNÉES | [2021/37] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 18.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP3860284 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]); |