EP3879735 - INFORMATION SENDING METHOD AND RECEIVING METHOD, INFORMATION SENDING APPARATUS AND RECEIVING APPARATUS, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2024/18] |
Former [2021/37] | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Qun No.018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2024/18] |
Former [2021/37] | 01 /
ZHAO, Qun No.018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33, Middle Xierqi Road, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2021/37] | Application number, filing date | 18939764.9 | 08.11.2018 | [2021/37] | WO2018CN114628 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020093326 | Date: | 14.05.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3879735 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3879735 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04L1/08, H04L5/00, H04W4/40, H04W76/14 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
H04L1/0038 (EP,CN,US);
H04W4/40 (EP,CN);
H04W72/02 (US);
H04L1/0052 (CN);
H04L1/08 (EP);
H04L5/001 (EP);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/0453 (US);
H04W72/20 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/37] | H04L5/00, H04W72/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSSENDEVERFAHREN UND -EMPFANGSVERFAHREN, INFORMATIONSSENDEVORRICHTUNG UND -EMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2021/37] | English: | INFORMATION SENDING METHOD AND RECEIVING METHOD, INFORMATION SENDING APPARATUS AND RECEIVING APPARATUS, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2021/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ENVOI D'INFORMATIONS ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCEPTION, APPAREIL D'ENVOI D'INFORMATIONS ET APPAREIL DE RÉCEPTION, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2021/37] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2021 | Translation filed | 01.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 06.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2015018617 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * page 7, line 32 - page 8, line 18 * * page 11, line 25 - page 13, line 43 *; | [A]WO2017052458 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M (PUBL) [SE]) [A] 1-12 * abstract ** page 22, paragraph 111 - page 23, paragraph 117 * |