EP3884368 - PRINT FLUID DELIVERY WITH MULTIPLE TANKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring TX 77389 / US | [2021/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSBORNE, William Scott 1070 NE Circle Blvd. 1115 SE 164th Ave Columbia Center, Suite 210 Corvallis, Oregon 97330-4239 / US | 02 /
WELTER, David D. 1070 NE Circle Blvd. Corvallis, Oregon 97330-4239 / US | 03 /
CANTRELL, John James Columbia Tech Center 1115 SE 164th Ave Columbia Center, Suite 210 Vancouver, Washington 98683 / US | 04 /
JARIABKA, Keith William Columbia Tech Center 1115 SE 164th Ave Columbia Center, Suite 210 Vancouver, Washington 98683 / US | [2021/39] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/39] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 18940699.4 | 20.11.2018 | [2021/39] | WO2018US62098 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020106282 | Date: | 28.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3884368 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 28.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12, B41J2/175 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
B41J2/17509 (EP,US);
B41J2/175 (EP);
B41J2/17523 (EP,US);
B41J2/1754 (EP);
B41J2/17553 (EP,US);
B41J2/17556 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] | Title | German: | DRUCKFLÜSSIGKEITSAUSGABE MIT MEHREREN TANKS | [2021/39] | English: | PRINT FLUID DELIVERY WITH MULTIPLE TANKS | [2021/39] | French: | DISTRIBUTION DE FLUIDE D'IMPRESSION AU MOYEN DE MULTIPLES RÉSERVOIRS | [2021/39] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 17.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/30] | 26.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012013687 (ISHIZAWA TAKU [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,5,8,9,12,13,15 * paragraph [0076]; figures 1-19 * [I] 2,3,6,7,10,11,14; | [XI]US2013235133 (WATANABE SHIGERU [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,9-11,14 * figures 1-9 * [I] 4-8,12,13,15; | [XI]US2015202882 (OHNISHI MASARU [JP]) [X] 1,9,13 * paragraphs [0046] , [ 0049] , [ 0089]; figures 1-7 * [I] 2-8,10-12,14,15; | [XI]JP2016112685 (CANON KK) [X] 1-3,9-11,13,14 * figures 1-10 *[I] 4-8,12,15; | [XI]US2017120609 (KIMURA YUKIMICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,9,13 * figures 1-9 * [I] 2-8,10-12,14,15; | [XI]US2018257380 (DANZUKA TOSHIMITSU [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,9-11,13,14 * figures 1-13 * [I] 4-8,12,15 | International search | [Y]US2006017787 (INOUE RYOJI [JP], et al) [Y] 2-8, 10-12, 14, 15 * , paragraphs [0155], [0158] *; | [A]US7097290 (YOSHIDA MASAHIKO [JP])[A] 1-15; | [XY]US2010194830 (YOSHIIKE MASATAKA [JP]) [X] 1, 9, 13 * , paragraphs [0004] - [0007], [0012], [0060] * [Y] 2-8, 10-12, 14, 15; | [A]US2014224139 (NADACHI MITSUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 |