EP3886923 - AIR PURIFYING COATING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bona AB Murmansgatan 130 21225 Malmö / SE | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHIERLMANN, John F. 4324 Oxford Mill Road Waxhaw, North Carolina 28173 / US | 02 /
PESHEL, Pietrina 2355 Balting Glass Drive Indian Trail, North Carolina 28076 / US | 03 /
LAWSON, Erica 131224 Purple Dawn Drive Charlotte, North Carolina 28213 / US | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/40] | Goodman, Simon John Nye Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 18941481.6 | 29.11.2018 | [2021/40] | WO2018US63097 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020112117 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3886923 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/00, C09D7/61, A61L9/04, B01D39/20, C09D7/40, C09G1/04, // C08K3/22 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
A61L9/046 (EP,US);
C09D1/00 (CN);
C09D5/14 (US);
A01N25/10 (US);
A01N59/16 (US);
B01D39/2079 (EP,US);
C09D133/04 (US);
C09D175/04 (US);
C09D5/00 (EP,CN);
C09D7/40 (CN);
C09D7/61 (EP,US);
C09D7/65 (CN);
C09D7/69 (EP,US);
C09D7/70 (EP,US);
C09G1/04 (EP);
B01D2239/0407 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0442 (EP);
B01D2239/1241 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/40] | A61L9/20, B01D46/42, B01D46/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Title | German: | LUFTREINIGENDES BESCHICHTUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2021/40] | English: | AIR PURIFYING COATING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME | [2021/40] | French: | SYSTÈME DE REVÊTEMENT DE PURIFICATION D'AIR ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LE FABRIQUER | [2021/40] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 11.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 10.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1246897 (RECKITT BENCKISER UK LTD [GB]); | [XYI]US2017247551 (LI HAIYAN [US], et al); | International search | [Y]US2015328490 (MCDANIEL C STEVEN [US]); | [XY]US2017247551 (LI HAIYAN [US], et al); | by applicant | EP1246897 | US2017247551 |