EP3887583 - METHODS FOR THROUGH-FLUID BONDING NONWOVEN WEBS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Han No. 35, Yu'an Road B Zone Tianzhu Konggang Development Zone, Shunyi District Beijing 101312 / CN | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Germany Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Straße 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 18941518.5 | 30.11.2018 | [2021/40] | WO2018CN118636 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020107421 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3887583 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.06.2020 | Supplementary international search report - requested on: | EP | 03.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | D04H3/14, D01F8/06 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
D04H3/16 (EP,US);
D04H1/54 (EP,US);
D04H3/007 (EP);
D04H3/011 (EP);
D04H3/018 (EP);
D04H3/147 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM FLUIDBINDEN VON VLIESBAHNEN | [2021/40] | English: | METHODS FOR THROUGH-FLUID BONDING NONWOVEN WEBS | [2021/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉS POUR LIAISON PAR FLUIDE DE BANDES NON TISSÉES | [2021/40] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 19.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/21] | 23.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/21] | Divisional application(s) | EP23215719.8 / EP4310229 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |