EP3893837 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS INCLUDING SAPINDUS AND GLEDITSIA EXTRACTS FOR PERSONAL CARE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samantha Beauty Corp. 10586 Garden Grove Blvd. Garden Grove, CA 92843 / US | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPEAKER, Tycho, Joseph 824 Western Drive Santa Cruz CA 95060 / US | 02 /
SIK, Elena 16506 S 164th St. Gilbert AZ 85295 / US | 03 /
NGUYEN, Samantha Bao, Anh 8972 Thorpe Ave. Westminster CA 92683 / US | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | SJW Patentanwälte Goethestraße 21 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/42] | Scheele Wetzel Patentanwälte Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18942934.3 | 13.12.2018 | [2021/42] | WO2018US65369 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020122913 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3893837 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/9789, A61K36/483, A61K36/77, A61Q19/10, A61K36/9066, A61K36/752, A61K36/42, A61K36/288, A61K8/9794, A61K8/92 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
A61K8/9794 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61K36/288 (EP);
A61K36/42 (EP);
A61K36/483 (EP);
A61K36/752 (EP);
A61K36/77 (EP);
A61K36/9066 (EP);
A61K8/922 (EP,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
A61Q5/002 (US);
A61Q5/02 (US);
A61Q5/06 (US);
A61Q5/12 (US);
A61K2800/5922 (US);
A61K2800/805 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K36/288, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/42, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/483, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/752, A61K2300/00 (EP); |
Former IPC [2021/42] | A61K8/9789, A61K36/483, A61K36/77, C11D7/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN MIT SAPINDUS- UND GLEDITSIA-EXTRAKTEN ZUR KÖRPERPFLEGE | [2021/42] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS INCLUDING SAPINDUS AND GLEDITSIA EXTRACTS FOR PERSONAL CARE | [2021/42] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS COMPRENANT DES EXTRAITS DE SAPINDUS ET DE GLEDITSIA POUR SOINS D'HYGIÈNE PERSONNELLE | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 17.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   13.03.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN105125472 (WANNAN MEDICAL COLLEGE) [Y] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XY]CN105596245 (JIN PINFU) [X] 1,2,5-15 * the whole document * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]CN107418749 (SHANDONG ZHONGYUANNENG TECH GROUP CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * [Y] 4 | International search | [Y]US6534091 (GARCES GARCES JOSEP [ES], et al) [Y] 5 * , col 2 In 18-22, col 3 In 31-51, col 12 In 7-9, col 20 In 18-27, col 23 Table 1. *; | [Y]US2009169652 (OSBORNE ROSEMARIE [US]) [Y] 11-14, 17, 18, 20 * , para [0009], [0016], [0023], [0036]-[0037], [0047]-[0049], [0155]-[0161]. *; | [XY]CN104739729 (WEI WENDONG) [X] 1, 6-10, 15, 16, 19 * , para [0005]-[0006], [0023]-[0026]; [machine translation to English retrieved 18 February 2019 (18.02.2019) via Google translate]. * [Y] 2-5, 11-14, 17, 18, 20; | [A]CN105125472 (WANNAN MEDICAL COLLEGE) [A] 1-20* , entire document, [machine translation to English retrieved 19 February 2019 (19.02.2019) via Google translate]. *; | [Y]AU2016222314 (HOLLAND SKYE MS [AU]) [Y] 2-4 * , para [0071]-[0076]. * |