EP3896459 - PORTABLE SAMPLE ADDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, FI, GR, HR, RS | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MGI Tech Co., Ltd. Main Building and Second Floor of No. 11 Building Beishan Industrial Zone Yantian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518083 / CN | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUI, Xingye Main Building and Second Floor of No.11 Building Beishan Industrial Zone Yantian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518083 / CN | 02 /
NIU, Zihua Main Building and Second Floor of No.11 Building Beishan Industrial Zone Yantian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518083 / CN | 03 /
XING, Chutian Main Building and Second Floor of No.11 Building Beishan Industrial Zone Yantian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518083 / CN | 04 /
LIU, Jian Main Building and Second Floor of No.11 Building Beishan Industrial Zone Yantian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518083 / CN | [2024/10] |
Former [2021/42] | 01 /
CUI, Xingye Main Building and Second Floor of No.11 Building Beishan Industrial Zone, Yantian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518083 / CN | ||
02 /
NIU, Zihua Main Building and Second Floor of No.11 Building Beishan Industrial Zone, Yantian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518083 / CN | |||
03 /
XING, Chutian Main Building and Second Floor of No.11 Building Beishan Industrial Zone, Yantian Distric Shenzhen, Guangdong 518083 / CN | |||
04 /
LIU, Jian Main Building and Second Floor of No.11 Building Beishan Industrial Zone, Yantian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518083 / CN | Representative(s) | Zaboliene, Reda Metida Business center Vertas Gyneju str. 16 01109 Vilnius / LT | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 18943138.0 | 13.12.2018 | [2021/42] | WO2018CN120864 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020118610 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3896459 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3896459 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/10 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
B01L9/527 (EP);
B01L9/52 (US);
G01N35/10 (US);
B01L2200/025 (US);
B01L2200/027 (EP);
B01L2200/04 (EP);
B01L2300/043 (EP);
B01L2300/0816 (EP);
B01L2300/0819 (US);
B01L3/502715 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARE PROBENZUGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2021/42] | English: | PORTABLE SAMPLE ADDING DEVICE | [2021/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AJOUT D'ÉCHANTILLON PORTATIF | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2021 | Translation filed | 09.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 08.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 06.03.2024 | FI | 06.03.2024 | HR | 06.03.2024 | LT | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.06.2024 | RS | 06.06.2024 | GR | 07.06.2024 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | LT | 06.03.2024 | |
NO | 06.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN101258402 (AKUBIO LTD [CH]) [A] 1-15* figure 1 *; | [YA]WO2012096703 (ILLUMINA INC [US], et al) [Y] 3 * figures 12, 13 * [A] 1,2,4-15; | [A]US2016129445 (COREY SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 4 *; | [XYI]US2018185849 (KAPLAN DAVID ELLIOTT [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-13 * figure 12 * [Y] 3 [I] 7,14,15 |