EP3899815 - SOFTWARE RECOGNITION USING TREE-STRUCTURED PATTERN MATCHING RULES FOR SOFTWARE ASSET MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Snow Software, Inc. 1801 E 6th St. No. 350 Austin, TX 78702 / US | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BJÖRKMAN, Peter Trångsundsvägen 50 J 142 64 Trångsund / SE | 02 /
LUNDER, Rolf, Georg Risevegen 21 2608 Lillehammer / NO | 03 /
HANSEN, Kenneth, Aas Torggata 102 2317 Hamar / NO | 04 /
KØHLER, Lars Strandgata 43 2317 Hamar / NO | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/43] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 18943600.9 | 17.12.2018 | [2021/43] | WO2018SE51326 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020130891 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3899815 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 25.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/31, G06F21/10, G06Q10/08 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
G06F21/105 (EP,US);
G06F8/70 (US);
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
G06F21/1073 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/43] | G06Q10/00, G06F16/31, G06F21/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Title | German: | SOFTWARE-ERKENNUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON BAUMSTRUKTURIERTEN MUSTERVERGLEICHSREGELN ZUR VERWALTUNG VON SOFTWARE-ASSETS | [2021/43] | English: | SOFTWARE RECOGNITION USING TREE-STRUCTURED PATTERN MATCHING RULES FOR SOFTWARE ASSET MANAGEMENT | [2021/43] | French: | RECONNAISSANCE DE LOGICIEL UTILISANT DES RÈGLES D'APPARIEMENT DE MOTIFS À STRUCTURE ARBORESCENTE POUR LA GESTION D'ACTIFS DE LOGICIELS | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 10.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007130127 (PASSMORE DALE [US], et al); | [XI]US2016026968 (FAN LIYA [CN], et al) | International search | [XA]US2007130127 (PASSMORE DALE [US], et al); | [A]US2010057520 (REJAI BARRY [US]); | [A]US2012304248 (WATTS GORDON [CA], et al); | [XA]US2016026968 (FAN LIYA [CN], et al); | [A]JP6062809B ; | [A]JP2017068481 (NEC CORP); |