Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3899815
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
26.06.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.06.2024 |
First examination report |
|
20.06.2024 |
Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.06.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.06.2024 |
First examination report |
|
10.11.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.01.2023 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.12.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.06.2022 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
24.06.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
24.06.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
03.05.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
18.02.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
18.02.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
26.01.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.12.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.09.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
24.09.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
03.09.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.08.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.08.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.07.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.07.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.07.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
10.07.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.07.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.07.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|