EP3874706 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CONTROLLING ACCESS TO AN ENTRANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhejiang Dahua Technology Co., Ltd. No.1187 Binan Road Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310053 / CN | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Yiping No. 1187 Binan Road Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310053 / CN | 02 /
WU, Yunbin No. 1187 Binan Road Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310053 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Jianming No. 1187 Binan Road Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310053 / CN | 04 /
ZENG, Xin No. 1187 Binan Road Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310053 / CN | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Wang, Bo Panovision IP Ebersberger Straße 3 85570 Markt Schwaben / DE | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 18944881.4 | 28.12.2018 | [2021/36] | WO2018CN124611 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020133138 | Date: | 02.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3874706 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00, G07C9/37, G07C9/26, // H04L29/06, H04L29/08 | [2021/45] | CPC: |
G07C9/26 (EP,US);
G07C9/00309 (EP);
G07C9/00563 (EP);
G07C9/27 (US);
G07C9/37 (EP);
H04L63/0861 (EP);
H04L67/12 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/36] | H04L29/06, G07C9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DES ZUGANGS ZU EINEM EINGANG | [2021/36] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CONTROLLING ACCESS TO AN ENTRANCE | [2021/36] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE CONTRÔLE D'ACCÈS À UNE ENTRÉE | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 30.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]CN106960491 (SHANGHAI YI YUAN INTELLIGENT TECH CO LTD) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0050] *; | [XI]WO2017181198 (STRIIV INC [US]) [X] 1-7,10-13,15 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * page 2, line 7 - page 25, line 8 * [I] 8,9,14; | [I]US2018146374 (GOLAN MEIR [IL], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 3A-6B ** paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0189] * |