EP3905595 - INDUSTRIAL CONTROL SYSTEM MONITORING METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM, AND COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2021/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Wen 7, Wangjing Zhonghuannan Lu Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | [2023/35] |
Former [2021/44] | 01 /
TANG, Wen Beijing 100102 / CN | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2021/44] | Application number, filing date | 18944895.4 | 26.12.2018 | [2021/44] | WO2018CN123911 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020132949 | Date: | 02.07.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3905595 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3905595 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02, H04L43/50, H04L43/062, // H04L43/12, G05B19/042, H04L41/0631 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
G05B23/0262 (EP);
H04L63/1416 (US);
H04L43/062 (EP);
H04L43/50 (EP);
G05B19/0428 (EP);
G05B23/0256 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/44] | H04L12/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINER INDUSTRIESTEUERUNG UND COMPUTERLESBARES MEDIUM | [2021/44] | English: | INDUSTRIAL CONTROL SYSTEM MONITORING METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM, AND COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM | [2021/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE DE SYSTÈME DE CONTRÔLE INDUSTRIEL, ET SUPPORT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2021/44] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2021 | Translation filed | 20.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 16.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | MC | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 30.08.2023 | |
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 30.11.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 30.11.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008104231 (DEY SUJIT [US], et al); | [Y]US2017093910 (GUKAL SREENIVAS [US], et al); | [XY]WO2017196216 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M (PUBL) [SE]) |