EP3905977 - SYSTEMS FOR TISSUE TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/45] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR TISSUE TREATMENT | ||
[2022/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avava, Inc. 275 Second Avenue, 3rd Floor Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2023/13] |
Former [2021/45] | For all designated states Avava, Inc. 185 Cambridge Street, Second Floor Boston MA 02114 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRESSER, Charles Holland c/o AVAVA, Inc. 185 Cambridge Street, 2nd Floor Boston, Massachusetts 02114 / US | 02 /
BHAWALKAR, Jayant c/o AVAVA, Inc. 185 Cambridge Street, 2nd Floor Boston, Massachusetts 02114 / US | 03 /
TING, Joseph c/o AVAVA, Inc. 185 Cambridge Street, 2nd Floor Boston, Massachusetts 02114 / US | [2023/03] |
Former [2021/45] | 01 /
DRESSER, Charles Holland Boston, Massachusetts 02114 / US | ||
02 /
BHAWALKAR, Jayant Boston, Massachusetts 02114 / US | |||
03 /
TING, Joseph Boston, Massachusetts 02114 / US | Representative(s) | LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf Patentanwalt Attorney at Law PartG mbB Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/45] | LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf PartG mbB Patentanwälte Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18945410.1 | 31.12.2018 | [2021/45] | WO2018US68192 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020142083 | Date: | 09.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3905977 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3905977 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/02, A61B18/20, A61N5/067, // A61B18/00, A61B34/20 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
A61B18/203 (EP,IL,KR);
A61B90/04 (KR);
A61B2018/00023 (EP,IL,KR);
A61B2018/00458 (EP,IL);
A61B2018/0047 (EP,IL);
A61B2018/00476 (EP,IL);
A61B2018/00565 (EP,IL);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,IL);
A61B2018/00642 (EP,IL);
A61B2018/00672 (EP,IL);
A61B2018/00678 (EP,IL);
A61B2018/00708 (EP,IL);
A61B2018/00714 (EP,IL);
A61B2018/00732 (EP,IL);
A61B2018/00744 (EP,IL);
A61B2018/00761 (EP,IL);
A61B2018/00821 (EP,IL);
A61B2018/20353 (EP,IL,KR);
A61B2018/20553 (EP,IL,KR);
A61B2018/205547 (KR);
A61B2018/2253 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/45] | A61B18/02, A61B18/20, A61N5/067 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME ZUR GEWEBEBEHANDLUNG | [2022/39] | English: | SYSTEMS FOR TISSUE TREATMENT | [2022/39] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE TRAITEMENT TISSULAIRE | [2022/39] |
Former [2021/45] | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR GEWEBEBEHANDLUNG | ||
Former [2021/45] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR TISSUE TREATMENT | ||
Former [2021/45] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT TISSULAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 23.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/45] | 02.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.01.2023 | CZ | 18.01.2023 | DK | 18.01.2023 | EE | 18.01.2023 | FI | 18.01.2023 | HR | 18.01.2023 | LT | 18.01.2023 | LV | 18.01.2023 | MC | 18.01.2023 | RO | 18.01.2023 | RS | 18.01.2023 | SE | 18.01.2023 | SI | 18.01.2023 | SK | 18.01.2023 | SM | 18.01.2023 | NO | 18.04.2023 | GR | 19.04.2023 | IS | 18.05.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/11] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
CZ | 18.01.2023 | ||
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SI | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
CZ | 18.01.2023 | ||
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
CZ | 18.01.2023 | ||
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 18.01.2023 | |
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 18.01.2023 | |
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 18.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001007068 (OTA YASUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012179227 (SCHOMACKER KEVIN [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2013150841 (SCHOMACKER KEVIN T [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2017304645 (SCHOMACKER KEVIN [US], et al) [A] 1-11* the whole document * | International search | [YA]US2001007068 (OTA YASUO [JP], et al) [Y] 22, 24-38, 40, 41 * , para [0044], [0047]-[0058], [0057] * [A] 23, 39; | [Y]US6436094 (REUTER ERIC M [US]) [Y] 31, 32* , col 5, In 51-62 *; | [YA]US2013150841 (SCHOMACKER KEVIN T [US], et al) [Y] 22, 24-38, 40, 41 * , para [0017], [0031], [0034]-[0038], [0041], [0043]-[0045], [0060] * [A] 23, 39; | [XY]US2016089202 (SCHOMACKER KEVIN [US], et al) [X] 16, 20, 21 * , para [0080], [0083]-[0084], [0089]-[0090], [0095]-[0096] * [Y] 1-15, 17-19; | [Y]WO2018112261 (NANOSPECTRA BIOSCIENCES INC [US]) [Y] 10 * , para [0105], [0107] *; | [Y]US2018177550 (ANDERSON RICHARD ROX [US], et al) [Y] 1-15, 17-19 * , para [0023], [0025], [0077], [0088], [0092], [0104], [0113], [0131] * | by applicant | US2001007068 | US2016199132 | US20180624388 |