EP3581746 - COMBINED DAMPING AND PULLING DEVICE FOR A MIDDLE DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, CH, FR, GB | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zimmer, Günther Im Salmenkopf 11 77866 Rheinau / DE | For all designated states Zimmer, Martin Im Salmenkopf 7 77866 Rheinau / DE | [2019/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/51] | Representative(s) | Thämer, Wolfgang Zürn & Thämer Patentanwälte Adalbert-Stifter-Straße 12 76275 Ettlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/51] | Thämer, Wolfgang Zürn & Thämer Patentanwälte Hermann-Köhl-Weg 8 76571 Gaggenau / DE | Application number, filing date | 19000283.2 | 11.06.2019 | [2019/51] | Priority number, date | DE20181004643 | 12.06.2018 Original published format: DE102018004643 | [2019/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3581746 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3581746 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E05F1/16, E05F5/00 | [2019/51] | CPC: |
E05F1/16 (EP);
E05F5/003 (EP);
E05Y2201/10 (EP);
E05Y2201/264 (EP);
E05Y2201/412 (EP);
E05Y2201/424 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] |
Former [2019/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOMBINIERTE DÄMPFUNGS- UND ZUZIEHVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE MITTELTÜR | [2019/51] | English: | COMBINED DAMPING AND PULLING DEVICE FOR A MIDDLE DOOR | [2019/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF COMBINÉ D'AMORTISSEMENT ET DE FERMETURE POUR UNE PORTE CENTRALE | [2019/51] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 16.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 06.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 18.01.2023 | DK | 18.01.2023 | EE | 18.01.2023 | ES | 18.01.2023 | FI | 18.01.2023 | HR | 18.01.2023 | LT | 18.01.2023 | LV | 18.01.2023 | MC | 18.01.2023 | NL | 18.01.2023 | RO | 18.01.2023 | RS | 18.01.2023 | SE | 18.01.2023 | SI | 18.01.2023 | SK | 18.01.2023 | SM | 18.01.2023 | NO | 18.04.2023 | GR | 19.04.2023 | IS | 18.05.2023 | PT | 18.05.2023 | GB | 11.06.2023 | IE | 11.06.2023 | LU | 11.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | FR | 30.06.2023 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/21] | CZ | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
MC | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SI | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
IE | 11.06.2023 | ||
LU | 11.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | CZ | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
MC | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SI | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
LU | 11.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | CZ | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
MC | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SI | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
MC | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | DK | 18.01.2023 | |
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | DK | 18.01.2023 | |
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | ES | 18.01.2023 | |
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 18.01.2023 | |
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 18.01.2023 | |
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 18.01.2023 | |
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 18.01.2023 | |
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 18.01.2023 | |
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 18.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009100717 (ZIMMER GUENTHER [DE], et al) [A] 1,6-11 * abstract *; | [XY]EP2730734 (HÄFELE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-11 * the whole document * [Y] 6; | [YA]WO2015091118 (HETTICH PAUL GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 6 * abstract * [A] 1,7-11; | [A]WO2017123147 (IKEA SUPPLY AG [CH], et al) [A] 1,6-11* abstract * | by applicant | DE102016007885 |