EP3608619 - HEAT EXCHANGER BOARD SYNCHRONOUS, SAWTOOTH-LIKE, PENT ROOF SHAPED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paul, Eberhard Lindenstraße 21 08132 Mülsen / DE | [2020/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | Findeisen, Andreas, et al Findeisen Neumann Scheit Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Pornitzstraße 1 09112 Chemnitz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/07] | Patentanwälte Findeisen Neumann Scheit Partnerschaft mbB Pornitzstraße 1 09112 Chemnitz / DE | Application number, filing date | 19000364.0 | 05.08.2019 | [2020/07] | Priority number, date | DE20181006457 | 10.08.2018 Original published format: DE102018006457 | [2020/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3608619 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F28F3/04, F28D9/00 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
F28F3/046 (EP);
F28D9/0037 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMETAUSCHERPLATINE SYNCHRON, SÄGEZAHNARTIG - PULTDACHFÖRMIG | [2020/07] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGER BOARD SYNCHRONOUS, SAWTOOTH-LIKE, PENT ROOF SHAPED | [2020/07] | French: | PLAQUE D'ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR SYNCHRONE, EN DENTS DE SCIE EN FORME DE TOIT À UN VERSANT | [2020/07] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/04] | 04.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2017111578 (RECAIR HOLDING B V [NL]) [X] 1-3 * pages 5-7; figures 1-5 * [A] 4 [I] 5-7; | [XAI]DE29824920U (FPL WAERMERUECKGEWINNUNG LUEFT [DE]) [X] 1-3 * pages 9-11; figures 2-4 * [A] 4 [I] 5-7; | [XAI]DE19813119 (INST ENERGETIK UND UMWELT GGMB [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * columns 4-6; figures 1-8 * [A] 2,3 [I] 6,7; | [XAI]DE10329153 (PAUL EBERHARD [DE]) [X] 1,4 * page 3; figures 1-2 * [A] 2,3 [I] 5-7; | [XDAI]DE19635552 (SLG PRUEF UND ZERTIFIZIERUNGS [DE]) [XD] 1,4 * columns 3-5; figures 1-4 * [A] 2,3 [I] 5-7; | [XDAI]DE29620248U (KUHR THOMAS [DE]) [XD] 1,4 * page 3; figures 1-2 * [A] 2,3 [I] 5-7 | by applicant | DE19635552 | DE29620248U | DE29916493U | DE29824920U |