EP3644507 - METHOD FOR STATIC GATE CLAMPING IN MULTI-OUTPUT GATE DRIVER SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies Austria AG Siemensstrasse 2 9500 Villach / AT | [2020/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fabbro, Simone Via Monte Lussari 40 33100 Udine / IT | 02 /
Frank, Wolfgang Auf dem Kreuz 26 86152 Augsburg / DE | 03 /
Norling, Karl Italienerstrasse 34 9500 Villach / AT | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Infineon Patent Department Intellectual Property Infineon Technologies AG Postfach 22 16 44 80506 München / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 19000479.6 | 21.10.2019 | [2020/18] | Priority number, date | US201816166953 | 22.10.2018 Original published format: US201816166953 | [2020/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3644507 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3644507 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/16 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
H03K17/163 (EP);
H03K17/687 (CN,US);
H02M1/096 (US);
H03F3/213 (CN);
H03K17/168 (EP);
H03K19/0016 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] |
Former [2020/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM STATISCHEN GATE-CLAMPING IN GATE-TREIBERSYSTEMEN MIT MEHREREN AUSGÄNGEN | [2020/18] | English: | METHOD FOR STATIC GATE CLAMPING IN MULTI-OUTPUT GATE DRIVER SYSTEMS | [2020/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SERRAGE DE GRILLE STATIQUE DANS DES SYSTÈMES D'ATTAQUE DE GRILLE À SORTIES MULTIPLES | [2020/18] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 27.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.09.2023 | 28.09.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24153995.6 / EP4336731 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.02.2024 | BG | 07.02.2024 | ES | 07.02.2024 | FI | 07.02.2024 | HR | 07.02.2024 | LT | 07.02.2024 | LV | 07.02.2024 | NL | 07.02.2024 | PL | 07.02.2024 | SE | 07.02.2024 | NO | 07.05.2024 | RS | 07.05.2024 | GR | 08.05.2024 | IS | 07.06.2024 | PT | 07.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
LV | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
PL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
PT | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 07.02.2024 | |
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 07.02.2024 | |
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 07.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US2015171852 (PANG SUNG MAN [KR]) [X] 7,8,10,13,15 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0070]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0085]; figure 4 * [A] 1-6,14 [Y] 11,12 [I] 9; | [YA]US2015318850 (HIYAMA KAZUAKI [JP]) [Y] 11 * paragraph [0208] - paragraph [0250]; figure 9 *[A] 1-10,12-15; | [XAYI]US2017288653 (YOKOI YOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,14 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0034]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0048]; figure 3 * [A] 7-11,13,15 [Y] 12 [I] 3,4,6 | Examination | US2004252435 | JP2011061896 |