EP3683200 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING OLEFINS FROM METHANOL AND/OR DIMETHYL ETHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/30] | PROCESS AND PLANT FR PRODUCING OLEFINS FROM OXYGENATES | ||
[2024/31] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.07.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIÉTÉ ANONYME POUR L'ÉTUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCÉDÉS GEORGES CLAUDE 75 Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahlers, Bernd Gartenstr. 12 63128 Dietzenbach / DE | 02 /
Castillo-Welter, Frank Obere Römerhofstr. 154 61381 Friedrichsdorf / DE | 03 /
Drosdzol, Christopher Arthur-von-Weinberg-Str. 12 60438 Frankfurt / DE | 04 /
Gorny, Martin Brunnenstr. 26 65760 Eschborn / DE | 05 /
Haag, Stéphane Tucholskystr. 59 60598 Frankfurt / DE | 06 /
Janko, Lutz Kranichsteiner Str. 63 64390 Erzhausen / DE | 07 /
Williams, Bryce Fasanenweg 35 60437 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Air Liquide L'Air Liquide S.A. Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/30] | Dropsch, Holger Air Liquide Forschung und Entwicklung GmbH Gwinnerstraße 27-33 60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 19020033.7 | 18.01.2019 | [2020/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3683200 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07C1/20, C07C11/06, C10G3/00, C07C4/06, C07C7/00, C07C7/09, C07C11/02 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
C07C1/20 (EP);
C07C4/06 (EP);
C07C7/005 (EP);
C07C7/09 (EP);
C10G3/42 (EP);
C10G2400/02 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C07C1/20, C07C11/02 (EP);
C07C1/20, C07C11/06 (EP);
C07C4/06, C07C11/02 (EP);
C07C4/06, C07C11/06 (EP);
C07C7/005, C07C11/02 (EP);
C07C7/005, C07C11/06 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] |
Former [2020/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON OLEFINEN AUS METHANOL UND/ODER DIMETHYLETHER | [2024/31] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING OLEFINS FROM METHANOL AND/OR DIMETHYL ETHER | [2024/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'OLÉFINES À PARTIR DE MÉTHANOL ET/OU D'ÉTHER DIMÉTHYLIQUE | [2024/31] |
Former [2020/30] | VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON OLEFINEN AUS OXYGENATEN | ||
Former [2020/30] | PROCESS AND PLANT FR PRODUCING OLEFINS FROM OXYGENATES | ||
Former [2020/30] | PROCÉDÉ ET INSTALLATION DE PRODUCTION D'OLÉFINES À PARTIR DE COMPOSÉS OXYGÉNÉS | Examination procedure | 01.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 22.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2012016786 (TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RES FELUY [BE], et al); | [IY]DE102013101575 (L’AIR LIQUIDE SOCIÉTÉ ANONYME POUR L’ETUDE ET L’EXPL DES PROCÉDÉS GEORGES CLAUDE [FR]); | [I]DE102014118967 (L’AIR LIQUIDE SOCIÉTÉ ANONYME POUR L’ETUDE ET L’EXPLOITATION DES PROCÉDÉS GEORG [FR]) | by applicant | DE102004052658 | DE102014112792 |