EP3821756 - BLISTER PACKAGE HAVING APPLICATOR THEREIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blisspack Co., Ltd. (Jeongwang-dong) 171, Gyeonggigwagidae-ro Siheung-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANH, Jong-Won (Bon-dong, Bon-dong Shindongah apartment) 9-1106, 134 Maebong-ro, Dongjak-gu 06906 Seoul / KR | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Ruzzu, Giammario Via Gulli, 5 40068 San Lazzaro di Savena (BO) / IT | [2021/20] | Application number, filing date | 19020643.3 | 15.11.2019 | [2021/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3821756 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A45D34/04, A45D37/00 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
A45D34/046 (EP);
A45D37/00 (EP);
B65D51/32 (EP);
B65D75/366 (EP);
A45D2200/1036 (EP);
A45D2200/1045 (EP);
B65D2575/366 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BLISTERVERPACKUNG MIT APPLIKATOR DARIN | [2021/20] | English: | BLISTER PACKAGE HAVING APPLICATOR THEREIN | [2021/20] | French: | EMBALLAGE-COQUE DOTÉ D'UN APPLICATEUR | [2021/20] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/17] | 10.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]KR20180071672 (BLISSPACK CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0020] - [0035]; figures 1-5 *; | [I]EP2202042 (ALCAN PACKAGING BEAUTY SERV [FR]) [I] 1 * paragraphs [0031] - [0036]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO2009158403 (ELC MAN LLC [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0323336 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |