EP3656918 - RAILWAY BARRIER DEVICE FOR MOBILE TRACK PROTECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/22] | DEVICE FOR MOBILE TRACK PROTECTION SYSTEM | ||
[2021/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WSO Warnsysteme und Sicherungstechnische Organisation Fahrweg GmbH GVZ Berlin Süd Märkische Allee 39/41 14979 Grossbeeren / DE | [2020/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scherer, Axel Ziegelmasch 8a 31061 Alfeld Leine / DE | 02 /
Friedrichs, Reinhard Thie 24 39365 Wefensleben / DE | [2020/22] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Schuster, Müller & Partner mbB Olvenstedter Strasse 15 39108 Magdeburg / DE | [2020/22] | Application number, filing date | 19020648.2 | 18.11.2019 | [2020/22] | Priority number, date | DE201810128994 | 19.11.2018 Original published format: DE102018128994 | [2020/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3656918 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3656918 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E01B26/00, E04G21/32 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
E01B26/005 (EP);
E04G21/3242 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] |
Former [2020/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GLEISABSPERRVORRICHTUNG FÜR MOBILE GLEISSICHERUNGSANLAGE | [2021/16] | English: | RAILWAY BARRIER DEVICE FOR MOBILE TRACK PROTECTION SYSTEM | [2021/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BARRIÈRE DE RAIL POUR INSTALLATION MOBILE DE SÉCURISATION DE VOIES | [2021/16] |
Former [2020/22] | VORRICHTUNG FÜR MOBILE GLEISSICHERUNGSANLAGE | ||
Former [2020/22] | DEVICE FOR MOBILE TRACK PROTECTION SYSTEM | ||
Former [2020/22] | DISPOSITIF POUR INSTALLATION MOBILE DE SÉCURISATION DE VOIES | Examination procedure | 02.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 02.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.11.2019 | AL | 18.08.2021 | CY | 18.08.2021 | CZ | 18.08.2021 | DK | 18.08.2021 | EE | 18.08.2021 | ES | 18.08.2021 | FI | 18.08.2021 | HR | 18.08.2021 | IT | 18.08.2021 | LT | 18.08.2021 | LV | 18.08.2021 | MC | 18.08.2021 | MK | 18.08.2021 | RO | 18.08.2021 | RS | 18.08.2021 | SE | 18.08.2021 | SI | 18.08.2021 | SK | 18.08.2021 | SM | 18.08.2021 | BG | 18.11.2021 | IE | 18.11.2021 | NO | 18.11.2021 | GR | 19.11.2021 | FR | 30.11.2021 | IS | 18.12.2021 | PT | 20.12.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 18.11.2019 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
IE | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
IE | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
IE | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
IE | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | CZ | 18.08.2021 | |
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 18.08.2021 | |
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | DK | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | ES | 18.08.2021 | |
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 18.08.2021 | |
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 18.08.2021 | |
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 18.08.2021 | |
NO | 18.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006180390 (THALER KEN [CA]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] , [0010] - [0012] - [0026] - [0035] * * figures 1-9 *; | [Y]WO2017178459 (FARESIN BUILDING S P A [IT]) [Y] 1-11 * page 1, lines 3-7 * * page 2, lines 4-15 * * page 3, line 14 - page 6, line 10 * * page 6, line 15 - page 7, line 25 * * figures 1-10 *; | [YA]GB2533033 (STEELHOARD LTD [GB]) [Y] 6 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraphs 3,5 * * page 3, paragraph 31 - page 4, line 2 * * page 4, paragraphs 3,5 * * page 5, paragraph 5 - page 6, paragraph 3 * * page 12, paragraph 5 - page 21, paragraph 1 * * figures 1-5,8b,9a,13a-13d,14-17,18d * [A] 1-5,7-11; | [A]FR3062667 (ALPHI [FR], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 1, lines 1-4 * * page 2, lines 6-31 * * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 27 * * page 6, line 5 - page 9, line 26 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2003132427 (ALLENBAUGH DWIGHT [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO9534719 | DE19751625 | DE20105680U | DE102014008184 | DE102015000206 | DE9411172U |