EP3495533 - CYLINDER LINERS WITH ADHESIVE METALLIC LAYERS AND METHODS OF FORMING THE CYLINDER LINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tenneco Inc. 500 North Field Drive Lake Forest, IL 60045 / US | [2019/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aharonov, Robert R. 6552 Alderley Way W. Bloomfield, MI 48322 / US | [2019/24] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/24] | Application number, filing date | 19150071.9 | 27.02.2014 | [2019/24] | Priority number, date | US201313801736 | 13.03.2013 Original published format: US201313801736 | [2019/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3495533 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3495533 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/02, C23C14/04, C23C14/06, C23C14/35, C23C28/04, C23C28/00, F02F1/00, H01J37/00, H01J37/34 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
F02F1/004 (EP,US);
C23C14/025 (EP,US);
C23C14/046 (EP,US);
C23C14/0605 (EP,US);
C23C14/35 (EP,US);
C23C28/322 (EP,US);
C23C28/34 (EP,US);
C23C28/343 (EP,US);
C23C28/347 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] |
Former [2019/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZYLINDERBUCHSEN MIT ADHÄSIVEN METALLSCHICHTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR FORMUNG DER ZYLINDERBUCHSEN | [2019/24] | English: | CYLINDER LINERS WITH ADHESIVE METALLIC LAYERS AND METHODS OF FORMING THE CYLINDER LINERS | [2019/24] | French: | REVÊTEMENTS DE CYLINDRE AVEC COUCHES MÉTALLIQUES ADHÉSIVES ET PROCÉDÉS DE FORMATION DE REVÊTEMENTS DE CYLINDRE | [2019/24] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 18.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/35] | 28.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14709851.1 / EP2971220 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2021 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6126793 (SUGIYAMA OSAMU [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 6 - column 8; figures 2, 3, 4 * * column 1, line 5 - line 18 *; | [A] - HAGEDORN D ET AL, "Magnetron sputter process for inner cylinder coatings", SURFACE AND COATINGS TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 203, no. 5-7, doi:10.1016/J.SURFCOAT.2008.06.166, ISSN 0257-8972, (20081225), pages 632 - 637, (20080624), XP025656889 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.surfcoat.2008.06.166 |