EP3490296 - COORDINATING HANDOVER IN CASE OF LTE DUAL-CONNECTIVITY WITH THE SECONDARY LINK BEING A WLAN LINK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2019/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUNDARARAJAN, Jay Kumar Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
SHARMA, Manu Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
MEYLAN, Arnaud Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
HORN, Gavin Bernard Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
SOMASUNDARAM, Kiran Kumar Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2023/34] |
Former [2019/22] | 01 /
SUNDARARAJAN, Jay Kumar Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA California 92121-1714 / US | ||
02 /
SHARMA, Manu Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA California 92121-1714 / US | |||
03 /
MEYLAN, Arnaud Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA California 92121-1714 / US | |||
04 /
HORN, Gavin Bernard Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA California 92121-1714 / US | |||
05 /
SOMASUNDARAM, Kiran Kumar Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA California 92121-1714 / US | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2023/34] |
Former [2019/22] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19150250.9 | 06.05.2014 | [2019/22] | Priority number, date | US201361820098P | 06.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361820098 P | US201414270295 | 05.05.2014 Original published format: US201414270295 | [2019/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3490296 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3490296 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/14, // H04W88/06, H04W88/10, H04W36/00 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
H04W36/00837 (EP,US);
H04W36/0066 (US);
H04W36/00692 (EP,US);
H04W36/144 (EP,US);
H04W36/24 (EP,US);
H04W36/0022 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/52] |
Former [2019/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HANDOVER-KOORDINIERUNG BEI EINER LTE-DUAL-KONNEKTIVITÄT MIT EINER WLAN-VERKNÜPFUNG ALS SEKUNDÄRER VERBINDUNG | [2019/22] | English: | COORDINATING HANDOVER IN CASE OF LTE DUAL-CONNECTIVITY WITH THE SECONDARY LINK BEING A WLAN LINK | [2019/22] | French: | COORDINATION DE TRANSFERT EN CAS DE DOUBLE CONNECTIVITÉ LTE AVEC LA LIAISON SECONDAIRE QUI EST UNE LIAISON WLAN | [2019/22] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2019 | Examination requested [2019/52] | 19.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14732680.5 / EP2995126 | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2023 | CZ | 23.08.2023 | DK | 23.08.2023 | EE | 23.08.2023 | ES | 23.08.2023 | FI | 23.08.2023 | HR | 23.08.2023 | IT | 23.08.2023 | LT | 23.08.2023 | LV | 23.08.2023 | NL | 23.08.2023 | PL | 23.08.2023 | RO | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SE | 23.08.2023 | SI | 23.08.2023 | SK | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | NO | 23.11.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | PT | 26.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
IT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 23.08.2023 | |
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2011159215 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | [Y]US2013016696 (ADJAKPLE PASCAL M [US], et al); | [A]WO2013052805 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US]); |