EP3517656 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PLATING A RECESS IN A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Semsysco GmbH Karolingerstrasse 7C 5020 Salzburg / AT | [2019/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARKUT, Franz Hofwiesenstrasse 36 9423 St. Georgen / AT | 02 /
WIRNSBERGER, Thomas Lexhöhe 23 9871 Seeboden / AT | 03 /
KNOLL, Oliver Bayernstrasse 5 5020 Salzburg / AT | 04 /
GLEISSNER, Andreas Steinwandweg 3 9873 Döbriach / AT | 05 /
OKORN-SCHMIDT, Harald Gerlitzenweg 10 9020 Klagenfurth / AT | 06 /
ENGESSER, Philipp Weißenfelser Weg 10 9500 Villach / AT | [2019/31] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/31] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19150854.8 | 08.01.2019 | [2019/31] | Priority number, date | GB20180001201 | 25.01.2018 Original published format: GB 201801201 | [2019/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3517656 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3517656 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C25D7/12, C25D5/02, C25D5/34, C25D17/00, C25D21/04, C25D5/00, H01L21/768, H05K3/42 | [2019/31] | CPC: |
C25D5/003 (EP,US);
H01L21/2885 (EP,GB,US);
B05C3/005 (US);
B05C3/02 (US);
B05C9/14 (US);
C23C18/1682 (EP);
C25D17/00 (CN);
C25D17/001 (EP,GB,US);
C25D21/04 (EP,US);
C25D21/12 (US);
C25D5/02 (EP,CN,GB,US);
C25D5/34 (EP,CN,US);
C25D7/123 (EP,GB,US);
H01L21/76877 (EP,US);
H01L21/76898 (EP,GB);
H05K3/42 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] |
Former [2019/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PLATTIERUNG EINER VERTIEFUNG IN EINEM SUBSTRAT | [2019/31] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PLATING A RECESS IN A SUBSTRATE | [2019/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE PLACAGE D'UN ÉVIDEMENT DANS UN SUBSTRAT | [2019/31] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 26.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5830805 (SHACHAM-DIAMAND YOSI [US], et al); | [XA]US2008296166 (WOODS CARL A [US], et al); | [XI]JP2011096800 (FUJI ELECTRIC HOLDINGS) |