EP3511123 - MACHINING CENTER WITH TWO TABLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PAOLINO BACCI S.R.L. Via Palermo, 32 56021 Cascina (PI) / IT | [2019/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACCI, Giuseppe via R. Gotti, 42 56025 Pontedera (Pi) / IT | 02 /
BACCI, Paolo via R. Gotti, 42 56025 Pontedera (Pi) / IT | 03 /
BACCI, Nino via R. Gotti, 42 56025 Pontedera (Pi) / IT | [2019/29] | Representative(s) | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing. A. Mannucci S.r.l. Via della Scala, 4 50123 Firenze / IT | [2019/29] | Application number, filing date | 19150923.1 | 09.01.2019 | [2019/29] | Priority number, date | IT20180000719 | 11.01.2018 Original published format: IT201800000719 | [2019/29] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3511123 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3511123 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q39/04, B27M1/00, B23Q1/01 | [2019/29] | CPC: |
B23Q39/04 (EP);
B23Q1/012 (EP);
B27C9/04 (EP);
B27M1/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] |
Former [2019/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BEARBEITUNGSZENTRUM MIT ZWEI TISCHEN | [2019/29] | English: | MACHINING CENTER WITH TWO TABLES | [2019/29] | French: | CENTRE D'USINAGE AVEC DEUX TABLES | [2019/29] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/09] | 16.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 23.11.2022 | AT | 23.11.2022 | CZ | 23.11.2022 | DK | 23.11.2022 | EE | 23.11.2022 | ES | 23.11.2022 | FI | 23.11.2022 | HR | 23.11.2022 | LT | 23.11.2022 | LV | 23.11.2022 | MC | 23.11.2022 | NL | 23.11.2022 | PL | 23.11.2022 | RO | 23.11.2022 | RS | 23.11.2022 | SE | 23.11.2022 | SI | 23.11.2022 | SK | 23.11.2022 | SM | 23.11.2022 | IE | 09.01.2023 | LU | 09.01.2023 | FR | 23.01.2023 | BE | 31.01.2023 | CH | 31.01.2023 | LI | 31.01.2023 | GB | 23.02.2023 | NO | 23.02.2023 | GR | 24.02.2023 | IS | 23.03.2023 | PT | 23.03.2023 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
IE | 09.01.2023 | ||
LU | 09.01.2023 | ||
FR | 23.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
GB | 23.02.2023 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
LU | 09.01.2023 | ||
FR | 23.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
LU | 09.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
LU | 09.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
LU | 09.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
LU | 09.01.2023 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 23.11.2022 | |
NO | 23.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19842386 (BIESSE SPA [IT]) [X] 1-8,11-15 * column 1, line 63 - column 3, line 18; figures 1, 2 * [A] 9,10; | [A]EP0906806 (PLURITEC ITALIA [IT]) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP2527081 (PAOLINO BACCI SRL [IT]) [A] 1-15* figure 7 * |