EP3680729 - ROTATABLY ADJUSTABLE BACK FOR A CLOCK PIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | 22.03.2024 | Change - inventor | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blancpain SA Le Rocher 12 1348 Le Brassus / CH | [2020/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAERING, Yann Impasse du Tilleul 17 2824 Vicques / CH | 02 /
JOBEZ, Sébastien Rue de La Libération 26 90100 Boron / FR | 03 /
DEBAUD, Nicolas 1807 Blonay / CH | [2024/17] |
Former [2020/29] | 01 /
HAERING, Yann Impasse du Tilleul 17 2824 Vicques / CH | ||
02 /
JOBEZ, Sébastien Rue de La Libération 26 90100 Boron / FR | |||
03 /
DEBAUD, Nicolas Route du Village 10 D 1070 Puidoux / CH | Representative(s) | ICB SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital, 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2020/29] | Application number, filing date | 19151038.7 | 09.01.2019 | [2020/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3680729 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3680729 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G04B37/00, G04B19/28, G04B45/00 | [2020/29] | CPC: |
G04B37/0008 (EP);
G04B37/12 (CN);
G04B45/0084 (US);
G04B19/286 (EP);
G04B37/11 (CN,US);
G04B45/0092 (EP);
G04B37/0075 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] |
Former [2020/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUSRICHTBARER BODEN FÜR EINE UHR | [2020/29] | English: | ROTATABLY ADJUSTABLE BACK FOR A CLOCK PIECE | [2020/29] | French: | FOND ORIENTABLE POUR UNE PIECE D'HORLOGERIE | [2020/29] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 15.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5923622 (CHUNG SHENG-KUN [TW]) [X] 1-4,6,11,12 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 45; figures 4,5,6 * [A] 5,7-10; | [T]EP1760556 (SWATCH GROUP MAN SERV AG [CH]) [T] 7* paragraph [0019] *; | [XA]EP1890203 (OMEGA SA [CH]) [X] 1-5,11,12 * paragraphs [0023] , [0024] , [0030]; figure 7 * [A] 6-10 |