17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
27.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
16.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] |
02.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
14.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
26.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
06.05.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
25.03.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
24.12.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] |
26.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] |
19.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
12.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
05.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
22.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
21.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
16.04.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
14.04.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
14.04.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.04.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
29.01.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.12.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.12.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.08.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.08.2020 |
First examination report |
|
10.04.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
10.04.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.05.2020 [2020/20] |
10.04.2020 |
Change - designated states |
published on 13.05.2020 [2020/20] |
07.04.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.09.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] |
11.01.2019 |
Change - representative |
|