Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10883795 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2021 | B2 | US2019219358 | 18.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815874401 | 18.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10782094 | Global Dossier | 22.09.2020 | B2 | US2019219359 | 18.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815950731 | 11.04.2018 | US201815874401 | 18.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3514476 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815874401 | 18.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3029353 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815950731 | 11.04.2018 | US201815874401 | 18.01.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3553456 | Global Dossier | 19.05.2021 | B1 | EP3553456 | 16.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815950731 | 11.04.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2881966T | 30.11.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201815950731 | 11.04.2018 |