EP3680618 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TRACKING A MOBILE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technische Universität München Arcisstr. 21 80333 München / DE | [2020/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIPELIDIS, Georgios Guardinistrasse 121 81375 München / DE | 02 /
TSIAMITROS, Nikolaos Karl-Theodor-Strasse 54 80803 München / DE | 03 /
PREHOFER, Christian Bozener Str 22 82319 Starnberg / DE | [2020/29] | Representative(s) | Lucke, Andreas Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/29] | Application number, filing date | 19151114.6 | 10.01.2019 | [2020/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3680618 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/20, G05D1/02 | [2020/29] | CPC: |
G01C21/206 (EP,US);
G01S5/0278 (EP,US);
H04W4/027 (EP,US);
H04W4/029 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERFOLGUNG EINER MOBILEN VORRICHTUNG | [2020/29] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TRACKING A MOBILE DEVICE | [2020/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE SUIVI D'UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE | [2020/29] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/25] | 05.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]GB2520751 (CAMBRIDGE CONSULTANTS [GB]) [XD] 1,2,6-9,13-15 * page 8, line 23 - page 16, line 25; figures 1, 2 * [I] 3-5,10-12; | [XI]EP2909582 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1,8,15 * paragraphs [0011] - [0015] - [ 0023] , [ 0075] *[I] 3-5,10-12 |