EP3511200 - DEVICE FOR DISPENSING AN ANTI-ICE AND/OR ANTI-WEAR FLUID ON A CABLE FOR THE TRANSMISSION OF ELECTRIC CURRENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/29] | DEVICE FOR DISPENSING AN ANTI-ICE AND/OR ANTI-WEAR FLUID ON A CABLE FOR THE TRANSMISSION OF ELECTRIC CURRENT AND/OR FOR EVALUATING THE WEAR OF A CABLE | ||
[2021/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dipsa Technes S.r.l. Via Buozzi, 51 40013 Castel Maggiore (Bologna) / IT | [2019/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ODORICI, FAUSTO C/O DIPSA TECHNES S.R.L. VIA BUOZZI, 51 40013 CASTEL MAGGIORE (BOLOGNA) / IT | [2019/29] | Representative(s) | Fuochi, Riccardo APTA S.r.l. Piazza dei Martiri, 1 40121 Bologna BO / IT | [2019/29] | Application number, filing date | 19151265.6 | 10.01.2019 | [2019/29] | Priority number, date | IT20180000757 | 11.01.2018 Original published format: IT201800000757 | [2019/29] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3511200 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3511200 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60M1/28, H02G7/16, B60L5/19 | [2019/29] | CPC: |
H02G7/16 (EP);
B60L5/19 (EP);
B60M1/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] |
Former [2019/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABGABE EINER EISSCHUTZ- UND/ODER VERSCHLEISSSCHUTZFLÜSSIGKEIT AUF EIN KABEL ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON ELEKTRISCHEM STROM | [2021/25] | English: | DEVICE FOR DISPENSING AN ANTI-ICE AND/OR ANTI-WEAR FLUID ON A CABLE FOR THE TRANSMISSION OF ELECTRIC CURRENT | [2021/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR DISTRIBUER UN FLUIDE ANTI-GLACE ET/OU ANTI-USURE SUR UN CÂBLE POUR LA TRANSMISSION DE COURANT ÉLECTRIQUE | [2021/25] |
Former [2019/29] | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABGABE EINER EISSCHUTZ- UND/ODER VERSCHLEISSSCHUTZFLÜSSIGKEIT AUF EIN KABEL ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON ELEKTRISCHEM STROM UND/ODER ZUR BEWERTUNG DES VERSCHLEISSES EINES KABELS | ||
Former [2019/29] | DEVICE FOR DISPENSING AN ANTI-ICE AND/OR ANTI-WEAR FLUID ON A CABLE FOR THE TRANSMISSION OF ELECTRIC CURRENT AND/OR FOR EVALUATING THE WEAR OF A CABLE | ||
Former [2019/29] | DISPOSITIF POUR DISTRIBUER UN FLUIDE ANTI-GLACE ET/OU ANTI-USURE SUR UN CÂBLE POUR LA TRANSMISSION DE COURANT ÉLECTRIQUE ET/OU POUR ÉVALUER L'USURE D'UN CABLE | Examination procedure | 17.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/09] | 17.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.01.2019 | AL | 10.11.2021 | CY | 10.11.2021 | CZ | 10.11.2021 | EE | 10.11.2021 | HR | 10.11.2021 | LT | 10.11.2021 | LV | 10.11.2021 | MC | 10.11.2021 | MK | 10.11.2021 | MT | 10.11.2021 | PL | 10.11.2021 | RO | 10.11.2021 | RS | 10.11.2021 | SI | 10.11.2021 | SK | 10.11.2021 | SM | 10.11.2021 | IE | 10.01.2022 | BG | 10.02.2022 | GR | 11.02.2022 | IS | 10.03.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/25] | HU | 10.01.2019 | |
AL | 10.11.2021 | ||
CY | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
MK | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
IE | 10.01.2022 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
CY | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
MK | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
IE | 10.01.2022 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
CY | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
IE | 10.01.2022 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
IE | 10.01.2022 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | CZ | 10.11.2021 | |
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 10.11.2021 | |
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 10.11.2021 | |
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | HR | 10.11.2021 | |
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | HR | 10.11.2021 | |
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | HR | 10.11.2021 | |
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | LT | 10.11.2021 | |
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 10.11.2021 | |
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 10.02.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH0571921 (HITACHI ELECTR ENG) [X] 1,3,8,13 * abstract * [A] 14; | [XA]DE102004045904 (REBS ZENTRALSCHMIERTECH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,6,12,13 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1,2 * [A] 14,15; | [X]CN101483330 (INST ELECTRICAL ENG CAS [CN]) [X] 1,2,13,14 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102011076615 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0011] ** paragraph [0027] *; | [XA]DE102014111120 (KUMMLER & MATTER AG [CH]) [X] 1,6,7,12,13 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1-4 * [A] 14,15; | [I]EP3051252 (HITACHI HIGH TECH FINE SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document * * paragraph [0027] * |