Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11221424 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2022 | B2 | US2019219714 | 18.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT201800000868 | 15.01.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110037717B | Global Dossier | 28.07.2023 | B | CN110037717 | 23.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | IT201800000868 | 15.01.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3510931 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2023 | B1 | EP3510931 | 17.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT201800000868 | 15.01.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT201800000868 | 15.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT201800000868 | 15.01.2018 |