EP3681031 - DOUBLE-STATOR PM MACHINE WITH 3RD ORDER CURRENT HARMONIC INJECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [2020/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENIAKAR, Minos Megalou Alexandrou 25 164 52 Argiroupoli, Athens / GR | 02 /
PERETTI, Luca Turbingränd 14 176 75 Järfälla / SE | 03 /
KAKOSIMOS, Panagiotis Norra Ringvägen 20A 722 15 Västerås / SE | [2020/29] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [2020/29] | Application number, filing date | 19151342.3 | 11.01.2019 | [2020/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3681031 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3681031 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/5387, H02M7/5395, H02P25/098, H02M1/00, H02K16/04 | [2020/29] | CPC: |
H02M7/53871 (EP);
H02K16/04 (CN,US);
H02P25/22 (US);
H02K11/33 (US);
H02K16/005 (EP);
H02K3/28 (US);
H02M7/5395 (EP);
H02P25/02 (CN);
H02P25/098 (EP);
H02M1/0067 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/46] |
Former [2020/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DOPPELSTATOR-PM-MASCHINE MIT INJIZIERUNG VON STROMOBERSCHWINGUNGEN DER DRITTEN ORDNUNG | [2020/29] | English: | DOUBLE-STATOR PM MACHINE WITH 3RD ORDER CURRENT HARMONIC INJECTION | [2020/29] | French: | MACHINE PM À DOUBLE STATOR AVEC INJECTION DE COURANT HARMONIQUE D'ORDRE 3 | [2020/29] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/46] | 07.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.01.2019 | AL | 13.10.2021 | AT | 13.10.2021 | CY | 13.10.2021 | CZ | 13.10.2021 | DK | 13.10.2021 | EE | 13.10.2021 | ES | 13.10.2021 | FI | 13.10.2021 | HR | 13.10.2021 | IT | 13.10.2021 | LT | 13.10.2021 | LV | 13.10.2021 | MC | 13.10.2021 | MK | 13.10.2021 | NL | 13.10.2021 | PL | 13.10.2021 | RO | 13.10.2021 | RS | 13.10.2021 | SE | 13.10.2021 | SI | 13.10.2021 | SK | 13.10.2021 | SM | 13.10.2021 | TR | 13.10.2021 | IE | 11.01.2022 | LU | 11.01.2022 | BG | 13.01.2022 | NO | 13.01.2022 | GR | 14.01.2022 | BE | 31.01.2022 | CH | 31.01.2022 | LI | 31.01.2022 | IS | 13.02.2022 | PT | 14.02.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/25] | HU | 11.01.2019 | |
AL | 13.10.2021 | ||
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CY | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
IT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
MK | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 11.01.2022 | ||
LU | 11.01.2022 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CY | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
IT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
MK | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 11.01.2022 | ||
LU | 11.01.2022 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CY | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
IT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 11.01.2022 | ||
LU | 11.01.2022 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
IT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 11.01.2022 | ||
LU | 11.01.2022 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 11.01.2022 | ||
LU | 11.01.2022 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
LU | 11.01.2022 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
LU | 11.01.2022 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
LU | 11.01.2022 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
LU | 11.01.2022 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 13.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2013047076 (AISIN SEIKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-9 * abstract *; | [YA]CN104795917 (UNIV HUAZHONG SCIENCE TECH) [Y] 1-3,5-9 * abstract * [A] 4; | [Y]CN104935221B (NINGBO BEILUN HAIBO MACHINERY CO LTD) [Y] 1,8,9 * abstract *; | [YA]CN105896856B (UNIV SOUTHEAST) [Y] 2,3,5-7,9 * abstract *[A] 4; | [Y]CN108964392 (HARBIN INST TECHNOLOGY) [Y] 1,8,9 * figures 1-4 * | Examination | EP2019473 | - SUNG-JUNG KIM ET AL, "Minimum copper loss drive method of three-phase dual-rotor BLDC machines", POWER ELECTRONICS AND MOTION CONTROL CONFERENCE (IPEMC), 2012 7TH INTERNATIONAL, IEEE, (20120602), doi:10.1109/IPEMC.2012.6258928, ISBN 978-1-4577-2085-7, pages 978 - 981, XP032215792 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IPEMC.2012.6258928 |