|
23.11.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2022 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.12.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.12.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.09.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
17.09.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
26.08.2021 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.12.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.10.2020 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.06.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2020 |
Request for change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.12.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.12.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.12.2019 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.12.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.12.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2019 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2019 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2019 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2019 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2019 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.05.2019 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.05.2019 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2019 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2019 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2019 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.2019 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2019 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2019 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.01.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
11.01.2019 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2019 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.01.2019 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.01.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
37 |