Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3493509 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3493509



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 883
25.08.2021 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
02.11.2020 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
24.09.2020 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.09.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.09.2020 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
11.09.2020 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
11.09.2020 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
04.05.2020 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
04.05.2020 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
04.05.2020 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 217
04.05.2020 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 217
21.02.2020 Examination started Search / examination 1
05.12.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.12.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
05.12.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
05.12.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
05.12.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
05.12.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
05.12.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.07.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
11.06.2019 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
08.05.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
07.05.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
07.05.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 5
07.05.2019 European search report Search / examination 2
07.05.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
26.04.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
08.03.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.03.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.03.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.03.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.03.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.03.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.03.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.03.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.03.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.01.2019 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.01.2019 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
14.01.2019 Claims Search / examination 3
14.01.2019 Description Search / examination 143
14.01.2019 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
14.01.2019 Drawings Search / examination 71
14.01.2019 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
14.01.2019 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
01.09.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 153