EP3511624 - COMBUSTOR FOR A GAS TURBINE ENGINE MITIGATING PARTICULATE ACCUMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/29] | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MITIGATING PARTICULATE ACCUMULATION ON A COMPONENT OF A GAS TURBINE | ||
[2022/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2021/12] |
Former [2019/29] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOURA, Dennis M. 25 Ellsworth Circle South Windsor, CT Connecticut 06074 / US | 02 /
CLUM, Carey 365 Oak Street East Hartford, CT Connecticut 06118 / US | [2019/29] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/29] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 19151712.7 | 14.01.2019 | [2019/29] | Priority number, date | US201862616874P | 12.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862616874 P | [2019/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3511624 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3511624 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/00, F01D25/12, F23R3/06 | [2019/29] | CPC: |
F23R3/06 (EP,US);
F01D25/12 (EP,US);
F02C7/18 (US);
F23R3/002 (EP,US);
F23R3/005 (EP,US);
F05D2260/201 (EP,US);
F05D2260/202 (EP,US);
F05D2260/221 (US);
F05D2260/607 (EP,US);
F23R2900/00004 (EP,US);
F23R2900/03041 (EP,US);
F23R2900/03043 (EP,US);
F23R2900/03044 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] |
Former [2019/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BRENNKAMMER FÜR EINE GASTURBINE WELCHE PARTIKELANSAMMLUNG VERRINGERT | [2022/12] | English: | COMBUSTOR FOR A GAS TURBINE ENGINE MITIGATING PARTICULATE ACCUMULATION | [2022/12] | French: | CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION POUR UNE TURBINE À GAZ PERMETTANT D'ATTÉNUER L'ACCUMULATION DE PARTICULES | [2022/12] |
Former [2019/29] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG DER PARTIKELANSAMMLUNG AN EINER KOMPONENTE EINER GASTURBINE | ||
Former [2019/29] | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MITIGATING PARTICULATE ACCUMULATION ON A COMPONENT OF A GAS TURBINE | ||
Former [2019/29] | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT D'ATTÉNUER L'ACCUMULATION DE PARTICULES SUR UN COMPOSANT D'UNE TURBINE À GAZ | Examination procedure | 17.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/09] | 17.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 07.09.2022 | AT | 07.09.2022 | CZ | 07.09.2022 | DK | 07.09.2022 | EE | 07.09.2022 | ES | 07.09.2022 | FI | 07.09.2022 | HR | 07.09.2022 | IT | 07.09.2022 | LT | 07.09.2022 | LV | 07.09.2022 | MC | 07.09.2022 | NL | 07.09.2022 | PL | 07.09.2022 | RO | 07.09.2022 | RS | 07.09.2022 | SE | 07.09.2022 | SI | 07.09.2022 | SK | 07.09.2022 | SM | 07.09.2022 | NO | 07.12.2022 | GR | 08.12.2022 | IS | 07.01.2023 | PT | 09.01.2023 | IE | 14.01.2023 | LU | 14.01.2023 | BE | 31.01.2023 | CH | 31.01.2023 | LI | 31.01.2023 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
DK | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
IT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
IE | 14.01.2023 | ||
LU | 14.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
DK | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
IE | 14.01.2023 | ||
LU | 14.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
DK | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
LU | 14.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
DK | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
LU | 14.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
DK | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
LU | 14.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
DK | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
DK | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 07.09.2022 | |
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 07.09.2022 | |
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 07.09.2022 | |
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 07.09.2022 | |
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6282905 (SATO YOSHICHIKA [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-12 * figure 2b *[I] 5; | [XI]WO2015117137 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,6-12 * paragraphs [0046] , [0 64] - [0067]; figures 4, 5, 8 * [I] 5 |