EP3516939 - TOWED AGRICULTURAL IMPLEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGCO Feucht GmbH Fellastrasse 1-3 90537 Feucht / DE | [2019/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riedel, Juergen AGCO Feucht GmbH 90537 Feucht / DE | [2019/31] | Representative(s) | AGCO Intellectual Property Department AGCO Limited Abbey Park Stoneleigh Kenilworth CV8 2TQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/31] | AGCO Intellectual Property Department AGCO Limited Abbey Park Stoneleigh Kenilworth, Warwickshire CV8 2TQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19151985.9 | 15.01.2019 | [2019/31] | Priority number, date | GB20180001525 | 30.01.2018 Original published format: GB 201801525 | [2019/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3516939 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A01B63/22, A01B73/00, A01D78/10 | [2019/31] | CPC: |
A01D78/1007 (EP,US);
A01B63/22 (EP,US);
A01B73/00 (EP,US);
A01D78/005 (US);
A01D80/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/11] |
Former [2019/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHE SCHLEPPVORRICHTUNG | [2019/31] | English: | TOWED AGRICULTURAL IMPLEMENT | [2019/31] | French: | OUTIL AGRICOLE TRACTÉ | [2019/31] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/11] | 31.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/13] | 24.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5918451 (VONESCH ANTHONY R [CA]) [A] 1,9,10* column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 6; figures 1-3 *; | [XI]CA2275118 (SCHULTE IND LTD [CA]) [X] 1-4,9,10 * page 3, line 11 - page 5, line 8; figures 1-3 * [I] 5-8; | [A]DE20117874U (NIEMEYER LANDMASCH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4,9,10 * page 7, line 16 - page 8, line 27; figures 1-4 *; | [XI]US2009273160 (FRIGGSTAD TERRY [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10 * paragraphs [0032] - [0043]; figures 1-8 * [I] 5-8; | [A]EP3257347 (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 1,5,9,10 * paragraphs [0006] - [0013]; figures 1-8 * |