Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007014240 | Global Dossier | 01.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70254005 | 25.07.2005 | US42976406 | 08.05.2006 | US70253905 | 25.07.2005 | US71536205 | 08.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006108145 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70254005 | 25.07.2005 | US66873605 | 06.04.2005 | US70253905 | 25.07.2005 | US71536205 | 08.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006108144 | Global Dossier | 01.02.2007 | A3 | WO2006108144 | 12.10.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US70254005 | 25.07.2005 | US66873605 | 06.04.2005 | US70253905 | 25.07.2005 | US71536205 | 08.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9675436 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2017 | B2 | US2015366647 | 24.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98358911 | 03.01.2011 | US201313964685 | 12.08.2013 | US49314806 | 25.07.2006 | US70254005 | 25.07.2005 | US70253905 | 25.07.2005 | US71536205 | 08.09.2005 | US201514840924 | 31.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9132002 | Global Dossier | 15.09.2015 | B2 | US2013324790 | 05.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98358911 | 03.01.2011 | US201313964685 | 12.08.2013 | US49314806 | 25.07.2006 | US70254005 | 25.07.2005 | US70253905 | 25.07.2005 | US71536205 | 08.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8944989 | Global Dossier | 03.02.2015 | B2 | US2012130156 | 24.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70254005 | 25.07.2005 | US66873605 | 06.04.2005 | US40011106 | 06.04.2006 | US70253905 | 25.07.2005 | US72885210 | 22.03.2010 | US201113295671 | 14.11.2011 | US71536205 | 08.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9022920 | Global Dossier | 05.05.2015 | B2 | US2012004500 | 05.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113226798 | 07.09.2011 | US70254005 | 25.07.2005 | US66873605 | 06.04.2005 | US70253905 | 25.07.2005 | US39991306 | 06.04.2006 | US71536205 | 08.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8777834 | Global Dossier | 15.07.2014 | B2 | US2011263931 | 27.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70254005 | 25.07.2005 | US201113179041 | 08.07.2011 | US42976406 | 08.05.2006 | US70253905 | 25.07.2005 | US71536205 | 08.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8535216 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2013 | B2 | US2011098526 | 28.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98358911 | 03.01.2011 | US49314806 | 25.07.2006 | US70254005 | 25.07.2005 | US70253905 | 25.07.2005 | US71536205 | 08.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8057383 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2011 | B2 | US2010234672 | 16.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70254005 | 25.07.2005 | US66873605 | 06.04.2005 | US40011106 | 06.04.2006 | US70253905 | 25.07.2005 | US72885210 | 22.03.2010 | US71536205 | 08.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7878969 | Global Dossier | 01.02.2011 | B2 | US2007055095 | 08.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US49314806 | 25.07.2006 | US70254005 | 25.07.2005 | US70253905 | 25.07.2005 | US71536205 | 08.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7981023 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2011 | B2 | US2007021649 | 25.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70254005 | 25.07.2005 | US42976406 | 08.05.2006 | US70253905 | 25.07.2005 | US71536205 | 08.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006229596 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70254005 | 25.07.2005 | US66873605 | 06.04.2005 | US40011106 | 06.04.2006 | US70253905 | 25.07.2005 | US71536205 | 08.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8016741 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2011 | B2 | US2006229493 | 12.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70254005 | 25.07.2005 | US66873605 | 06.04.2005 | US70253905 | 25.07.2005 | US39991306 | 06.04.2006 | US71536205 | 08.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10251738 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2019 | B2 | US2017252142 | 07.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98358911 | 03.01.2011 | US201313964685 | 12.08.2013 | US49314806 | 25.07.2006 | US70254005 | 25.07.2005 | US70253905 | 25.07.2005 | US71536205 | 08.09.2005 | US201715599941 | 19.05.2017 | US201514840924 | 31.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5502811B | Global Dossier | 28.05.2014 | B2 | JP2011235122 | 24.11.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US70254005 | 25.07.2005 | US66873605 | 06.04.2005 | US70253905 | 25.07.2005 | US71536205 | 08.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5058969B | Global Dossier | 24.10.2012 | B2 | JP2008535577 | 04.09.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US70254005 | 25.07.2005 | WO2006US13042 | 06.04.2006 | US66873605 | 06.04.2005 | US70253905 | 25.07.2005 | US71536205 | 08.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2974692 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2019 | B1 | EP2974692 | 20.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70254005 | 25.07.2005 | WO2006US28964 | 25.07.2006 | US70253905 | 25.07.2005 | EP06788512 | 25.07.2006 | US71536205 | 08.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2881082 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2021 | B8 | EP2881082 | 24.11.2021 | B1 | EP2881082 | 22.07.2015 | A3 | EP2881082 | 10.06.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US70254005 | 25.07.2005 | US66873605 | 06.04.2005 | WO2006US13043 | 06.04.2006 | US70253905 | 25.07.2005 | EP06740717 | 06.04.2006 | US71536205 | 08.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1909691 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2015 | B1 | EP1909691 | 16.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70254005 | 25.07.2005 | WO2006US28964 | 25.07.2006 | US70253905 | 25.07.2005 | US71536205 | 08.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1909690 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70254005 | 25.07.2005 | WO2006US28963 | 25.07.2006 | US42976406 | 08.05.2006 | US70253905 | 25.07.2005 | US71536205 | 08.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1871282 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2015 | B1 | EP1871282 | 02.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70254005 | 25.07.2005 | US66873605 | 06.04.2005 | WO2006US13043 | 06.04.2006 | US70253905 | 25.07.2005 | US71536205 | 08.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1871281 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2014 | B1 | EP1871281 | 02.01.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US70254005 | 25.07.2005 | WO2006US13042 | 06.04.2006 | US66873605 | 06.04.2005 | US70253905 | 25.07.2005 | US71536205 | 08.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3533416 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70254005 | 25.07.2005 | WO2006US28964 | 25.07.2006 | EP15179582 | 25.07.2006 | US70253905 | 25.07.2005 | EP06788512 | 25.07.2006 | US71536205 | 08.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2449196T | 18.03.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US70254005 | 25.07.2005 | WO2006US13042 | 06.04.2006 | US66873605 | 06.04.2005 | US70253905 | 25.07.2005 | US71536205 | 08.09.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2536748T | 28.05.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US70254005 | 25.07.2005 | US66873605 | 06.04.2005 | WO2006US13043 | 06.04.2006 | US70253905 | 25.07.2005 | US71536205 | 08.09.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007014241 | Global Dossier | 01.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70254005 | 25.07.2005 | US70253905 | 25.07.2005 | US71536205 | 08.09.2005 | Type | Earlier application | EP1909691 | EP2974692 |