EP3533416 - PELVIC FLOOR REPAIR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited Clarendon House 2 Church Street Hamilton HM11 / BM | [2019/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHU, Michael S.H. 121 Browne Street Brookline, MA 02446 / US | 02 /
NOWLIN, Brett 35 Greenbrier Lane Bridgewater, MA 02324 / US | [2019/36] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [2019/36] | Application number, filing date | 19151996.6 | 25.07.2006 | [2019/36] | Priority number, date | US200570253905P | 25.07.2005 Original published format: US 70253905 P | US200570254005P | 25.07.2005 Original published format: US 70254005 P | US200571536205P | 08.09.2005 Original published format: US 71536205 P | [2019/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3533416 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00, A61B17/04, A61B17/06, // A61B17/00 | [2019/36] | CPC: |
A61F2/0045 (EP,US);
A61B17/0401 (EP,US);
A61B17/06066 (EP,US);
A61B17/06109 (EP,US);
A61F2/0063 (EP,US);
A61F2/04 (US);
A61B2017/0046 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00805 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06042 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06076 (EP,US);
A61F2002/0072 (US);
A61F2220/0008 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0004 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IE, NL [2020/15] |
Former [2019/36] | DE, FR, IE, NL | Title | German: | BECKENBODENREPARATURSYSTEM | [2019/36] | English: | PELVIC FLOOR REPAIR SYSTEM | [2019/36] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RÉPARATION DE PLANCHER PELVIEN | [2019/36] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 04.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.08.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/37] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06788512.9 / EP1909691 | EP15179582.0 / EP2974692 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2005131393 (CHU MICHAEL S H [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-15 * paragraphs [0177] , [0224] , [0225] , [0322]; figures 7-9,39,42,45-48,65 * [A] 5-7; | [XI]US2002151910 (GELLMAN BARRY N [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8,10,12-14 * paragraphs [0124] , [0226] , [0230] , [0231]; figures 1A, 11I,13-16 * [I] 9,11 | by applicant | US6638210 | US6042534 | US6755781 | US6666817 | US6042592 | US6375662 | US6669706 | US6752814 | US6197036 | US6691711 | US6884212 | US6911003 | US20060400111 | US20060542365 | US20050152898 | US20040918123 | US20030641376 | US20030641192 | US20030641170 | US20030640838 | US20030460112 | US20030631364 | US20020092872 | US20040939191 | US20040774842 | US20040774826 | US20010015114 | US20040973010 | US20040957926 | US20040832653 | US20030642397 | US20030642395 | US20030642365 | US20030641487 | US20020094352 | US20020093498 | US20020093450 | US20020093424 | US20020093398 | US20020093371 | US20040840646 | US20040834943 | US20040804718 | US20050565505 | US20060399913 |