EP3489023 - STAMP, IN PARTICULAR STAND STAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trodat GmbH Linzerstraße 156 4600 Wels / AT | [2019/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scharinger, Herbert Rilkestrasse 45 4600 Wels / AT | 02 /
Leibezeder, Reinhard Schmiedtfeld 21-1 4152 Saleinsbach / AT | 03 /
Lindner, Helmut Thomasberg 13 4722 Peuerbach / AT | [2019/22] | Application number, filing date | 19152061.8 | 08.06.2016 | [2019/22] | Priority number, date | AT20150050473 | 10.06.2015 Original published format: AT 504732015 | [2019/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3489023 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3489023 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B41K1/42, B41K1/04, B41K1/40, B41K1/56, B41F1/38 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
B41K1/04 (EP,CN,US);
B41K1/40 (EP,AT,US);
B41K1/38 (US);
B41K1/10 (AT);
B41K1/36 (AT,CN);
B41K1/42 (EP,US);
B41K1/56 (EP,AT,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/22] | Title | German: | STEMPEL, INSBESONDERE STATIV-STEMPEL | [2019/22] | English: | STAMP, IN PARTICULAR STAND STAMP | [2019/22] | French: | TAMPON, EN PARTICULIER TAMPON DE TREPIED | [2020/01] |
Former [2019/22] | POINÇON, EN PARTICULIER POINÇON TRÉPIED | Examination procedure | 11.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2019 | Examination requested [2019/51] | 11.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16738647.3 / EP3307548 | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   17.07.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.06.2016 | AL | 11.03.2020 | CY | 11.03.2020 | DK | 11.03.2020 | EE | 11.03.2020 | ES | 11.03.2020 | FI | 11.03.2020 | HR | 11.03.2020 | IT | 11.03.2020 | LT | 11.03.2020 | LV | 11.03.2020 | MC | 11.03.2020 | MK | 11.03.2020 | MT | 11.03.2020 | NL | 11.03.2020 | PL | 11.03.2020 | RO | 11.03.2020 | RS | 11.03.2020 | SE | 11.03.2020 | SI | 11.03.2020 | SK | 11.03.2020 | SM | 11.03.2020 | IE | 08.06.2020 | LU | 08.06.2020 | BG | 11.06.2020 | NO | 11.06.2020 | GR | 12.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | IS | 11.07.2020 | PT | 05.08.2020 | [2023/41] |
Former [2022/31] | HU | 08.06.2016 | |
AL | 11.03.2020 | ||
CY | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
MK | 11.03.2020 | ||
MT | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
IE | 08.06.2020 | ||
LU | 08.06.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/30] | HU | 08.06.2016 | |
AL | 11.03.2020 | ||
CY | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
MT | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
IE | 08.06.2020 | ||
LU | 08.06.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/28] | HU | 08.06.2016 | |
CY | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
MT | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
IE | 08.06.2020 | ||
LU | 08.06.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | DK | 11.03.2020 | |
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
IE | 08.06.2020 | ||
LU | 08.06.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | DK | 11.03.2020 | |
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
IE | 08.06.2020 | ||
LU | 08.06.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | DK | 11.03.2020 | |
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
LU | 08.06.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | DK | 11.03.2020 | |
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | DK | 11.03.2020 | |
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | DK | 11.03.2020 | |
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | EE | 11.03.2020 | |
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
NO | 11.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0048843 (COLOP STEMPELERZEUGUNG SKOPEK [AT], et al) [A] 1-6* page 6, line 7 - page 9, line 12; figures 1,2 *; | [A]AT501318 (COLOP STEMPELERZEUGUNG SKOPEK [AT]) [A] 1-6 * page 5, line 22 - page 10, line 9; figure 4 *; | [A]DE102005044205 (ACKERET CONSULTING & ENGINEERI [CH]) [A] 1-6 * figure 5 *; | [A]EP2591921 (TRODAT GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0088]; figures 29-35 * | by applicant | EP0804344 | WO2004003915 | AT501318B | EP1841599 | US2009255427 | WO2010085828 | DE202010007577U | EP2384283 | EP2591921 | WO2014172738 |