EP3513903 - FAN BLADE OF A GAS TURBINE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/30] | FAN BLADE WITH FILLED POCKET | ||
[2020/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2021/12] |
Former [2019/30] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSEN, James O. 57 Needletree Lane Glastonbury, CT Connecticut 06033 / US | 02 /
GRAVES, William R 69 Highland Drive Amston, CT Connecticut 06231 / US | 03 /
WEISSE, Michael A. 64 Autumn Drive Tolland, CT Connecticut 06084 / US | 04 /
HERTEL, Christopher J. 64 Sunset Blvd. Wethersfield, CT Connecticut 06109 / US | 05 /
BALES, Daniel A. 2 Sconsett Bluff Avon, CT Connecticut 06001 / US | [2019/30] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2019/30] | Application number, filing date | 19152097.2 | 16.01.2019 | [2019/30] | Priority number, date | US201815874477 | 18.01.2018 Original published format: US201815874477 | [2019/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3513903 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3513903 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3513903 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B23P15/04, F01D5/16, F01D5/28 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
F01D5/288 (EP,US);
F01D5/147 (US);
B23P15/04 (EP,US);
F01D5/16 (EP,US);
F01D5/282 (US);
F02K3/06 (US);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2220/36 (EP,US);
F05D2230/25 (EP,US);
F05D2230/30 (US);
F05D2230/40 (EP,US);
F05D2250/241 (EP,US);
F05D2300/2102 (EP,US);
F05D2300/431 (EP,US);
F05D2300/437 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] |
Former [2019/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LÜFTERSCHAUFEL EINES TURBINENTRIEBWERKES | [2020/28] | English: | FAN BLADE OF A GAS TURBINE ENGINE | [2020/28] | French: | PALE DE VENTILATEUR DE MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ | [2020/28] |
Former [2019/30] | LÜFTERSCHAUFEL MIT GEFÜLLTER TASCHE | ||
Former [2019/30] | FAN BLADE WITH FILLED POCKET | ||
Former [2019/30] | PALE DE VENTILATEUR COMPORTANT UNE POCHE REMPLIE | Examination procedure | 24.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 24.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.01.2019 | AL | 30.12.2020 | AT | 30.12.2020 | CY | 30.12.2020 | CZ | 30.12.2020 | DK | 30.12.2020 | EE | 30.12.2020 | ES | 30.12.2020 | FI | 30.12.2020 | HR | 30.12.2020 | IT | 30.12.2020 | LT | 30.12.2020 | LV | 30.12.2020 | MC | 30.12.2020 | MK | 30.12.2020 | NL | 30.12.2020 | PL | 30.12.2020 | RO | 30.12.2020 | RS | 30.12.2020 | SE | 30.12.2020 | SI | 30.12.2020 | SK | 30.12.2020 | SM | 30.12.2020 | IE | 16.01.2021 | LU | 16.01.2021 | BE | 31.01.2021 | BG | 30.03.2021 | NO | 30.03.2021 | GR | 31.03.2021 | IS | 30.04.2021 | PT | 30.04.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 16.01.2019 | |
AL | 30.12.2020 | ||
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CY | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
SM | 30.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.01.2021 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CY | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.01.2021 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
NL | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.01.2021 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.01.2021 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.01.2021 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.01.2021 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.01.2021 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.01.2021 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.01.2021 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | AT | 30.12.2020 | |
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 30.12.2020 | |
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 30.12.2020 | |
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 30.12.2020 | |
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | EE | 30.12.2020 | |
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 30.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0926312 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-4,6-9,11-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] * [A] 5,10; | [XA]US5947688 (SCHILLING JAN C [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6-8,15 * abstract * * column 3, line 20 - column 3, line 30 * * column 3, line 39 - column 3, line 43 * * column 3, line 49 - column 3, line 51 * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 26 * [A] 2,4,5,9-14; | [XA]US2002090302 (NORRIS JENNIFER M [GB], et al) [X] 1,4,5,8,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0068] * [A] 2,3,6,7,9-14; | [XA]US6454536 (EVANS CHARLES R [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6-11,15 * abstract * * column 1, line 7 - column 1, line 60 * * column 4, line 26 - column 6, line 45 * * column 6, line 64 - column 7, line 31 * [A] 2,4,5,12-14; | [XA]US2014294594 (SPOONIRE ROSS ASHELY [US], et al) [X] 1-5,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0041] * [A] 6-14; | [A]EP3184180 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 2 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] ** paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] * |