Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11155680 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2021 | B2 | US2020024392 | 23.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201311376 | 26.06.2013 | US201916587174 | 30.09.2019 | US201514901150 | 28.12.2015 | WO2014GB51936 | 25.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10428179 | Global Dossier | 01.10.2019 | B2 | US2016152769 | 02.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201311376 | 26.06.2013 | WO2014GB51936 | 25.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102034516B | Global Dossier | 21.10.2019 | B1 | KR20180104188 | 19.09.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201311376 | 26.06.2013 | WO2014GB51936 | 25.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101901567B | Global Dossier | 27.09.2018 | B1 | KR20160024998 | 07.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201311376 | 26.06.2013 | WO2014GB51936 | 25.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6339184B | Global Dossier | 06.06.2018 | B2 | JP2016526598 | 05.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201311376 | 26.06.2013 | WO2014GB51936 | 25.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3828223 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14737311 | 25.06.2014 | GB201311376 | 26.06.2013 | EP19152608 | 25.06.2014 | WO2014GB51936 | 25.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3013888 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2019 | B1 | EP3013888 | 04.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201311376 | 26.06.2013 | WO2014GB51936 | 25.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110845837B | Global Dossier | 30.08.2022 | B | CN110845837 | 28.02.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201311376 | 26.06.2013 | CN201480037202 | 25.06.2014 | WO2014GB51936 | 25.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105555835B | Global Dossier | 25.10.2019 | B | CN105555835 | 04.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201311376 | 26.06.2013 | WO2014GB51936 | 25.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3502163 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2021 | B1 | EP3502163 | 26.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14737311 | 25.06.2014 | GB201311376 | 26.06.2013 | WO2014GB51936 | 25.06.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014207458 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201311376 | 26.06.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6596538B | Global Dossier | 23.10.2019 | B2 | JP2018135534 | 30.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201311376 | 26.06.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB201311376D0 | 14.08.2013 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201311376 | 26.06.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2517570 | 03.03.2021 | B | GB2517570 | 25.02.2015 | A | GB201411290D0 | 06.08.2014 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201311376 | 26.06.2013 | Type | Divisional application | EP3828223 | Type | Earlier application | EP3013888 |