EP3683397 - FRAME WITH PROFILE CONNECTORS COMPRISING SWIVEL JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Büdenbender, Arnd Marburger Strasse 46 57250 Netphen-Deuz / DE | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | 02 /
* * * | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Feucker, Max Martin, et al Becker & Müller Patentanwälte Turmstraße 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | [2020/30] | Application number, filing date | 19152738.1 | 21.01.2019 | [2020/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3683397 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3683397 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/24, E06B9/52 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
E06B9/24 (EP,US);
E06B9/522 (EP,US);
E06B1/045 (US);
E06B9/06 (US);
E06B9/52 (EP,US);
E06B2009/527 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Title | German: | RAHMEN MIT DREHGELENK AUFWEISENDEN PROFILVERBINDERN | [2020/30] | English: | FRAME WITH PROFILE CONNECTORS COMPRISING SWIVEL JOINT | [2020/30] | French: | CADRE POURVU DE RACCORDS DE PROFILÉ COMPORTANT UNE ARTICULATION ROTATIVE | [2020/30] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 26.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 17.02.2021 | CY | 17.02.2021 | EE | 17.02.2021 | HR | 17.02.2021 | LT | 17.02.2021 | LV | 17.02.2021 | MC | 17.02.2021 | MK | 17.02.2021 | RO | 17.02.2021 | RS | 17.02.2021 | SM | 17.02.2021 | BG | 17.05.2021 | IS | 17.06.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
CY | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | EE | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | EE | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | HR | 17.02.2021 | |
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | HR | 17.02.2021 | |
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | HR | 17.02.2021 | |
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | HR | 17.02.2021 | |
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | HR | 17.02.2021 | |
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | LT | 17.02.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006180283 (ANDERSEN JESPER [DK]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]EP1788186 (LINDAM LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0047] - [0052] *; | [AD]EP3138990 (BUEDENBENDER ARND [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * | Examination | EP2682558 | by applicant | DE102015116588 | EP3138990 |