EP3503449 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ERROR CONTROL IN TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/26] | METHOD AND APPARATUSS FOR ERROR CONTROL IN TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS | ||
[2020/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GÖRANSSON, Bo Silverdalsvägen 67 SE-191 38 Sollentuna / SE | 02 /
TORSNER, Johan Bergtrollsvägen 2 FI-02400 Kyrkslätt / FI | 03 /
PARKVALL, Stefan Hermelinstigen 24 SE-167 57 Bromma / SE | [2020/39] |
Former [2019/26] | 01 /
GÖRANSSON, Bo Silverdalsvägen 67 SE-191 38 SOLLENTUNA / SE | ||
02 /
TORSNER, Johan Bergtrollsvägen 2 FI-02400 KYRKSLÄTT / FI | |||
03 /
PARKVALL, Stefan Hermelinstigen 24 SE-167 57 BROMMA / SE | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2019/26] | Application number, filing date | 19152752.2 | 26.10.2007 | [2019/26] | Priority number, date | SE20060002300 | 31.10.2006 Original published format: SE 0602300 | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3503449 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3503449 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18, H04B7/06, H04L1/06, H04L1/00, H04W72/12 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
H04L1/1887 (EP,US);
H04B7/0697 (US);
H04L1/06 (EP,US);
H04L1/1812 (EP,US);
H04L1/1822 (EP,US);
H04L1/1896 (EP,US);
H04W72/21 (US);
H04L1/0003 (EP,US);
H04L1/0007 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR FEHLERKONTROLLE IN TELEKOMUNICATIONSYSTEMEN | [2019/26] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ERROR CONTROL IN TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS | [2020/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE CONTRÔLE D'ERREUR DANS DE TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTÈMES | [2020/20] |
Former [2019/26] | METHOD AND APPARATUSS FOR ERROR CONTROL IN TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS | ||
Former [2019/26] | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE D'ERREUR DANS DES SYSTÈMES DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATIONS | Examination procedure | 21.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 24.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07835366.1 / EP2078368 | EP14191291.5 / EP2849380 | Divisional application(s) | EP20191548.5 / EP3780450 | EP23179592.3 | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.10.2007 | CY | 23.09.2020 | CZ | 23.09.2020 | DK | 23.09.2020 | EE | 23.09.2020 | FI | 23.09.2020 | LT | 23.09.2020 | LV | 23.09.2020 | MC | 23.09.2020 | MT | 23.09.2020 | RO | 23.09.2020 | SI | 23.09.2020 | SK | 23.09.2020 | LU | 26.10.2020 | BG | 23.12.2020 | IS | 23.01.2021 | [2022/28] |
Former [2021/37] | CZ | 23.09.2020 | |
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
LU | 26.10.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 23.09.2020 | |
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
LU | 26.10.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/31] | CZ | 23.09.2020 | |
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
LU | 26.10.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | CZ | 23.09.2020 | |
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | CZ | 23.09.2020 | |
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 23.09.2020 | |
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
BG | 23.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1404048 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0019] ** figures 2-3 *; | [A]US2004233887 (MEILING AXEL [DE], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0021] * * claim 1 * |