Designated contracting states | AL | Lapse: 14.04.2021 | AT | | BE | | BG | Lapse: 14.07.2021 | CH | | CY | Lapse: 14.04.2021 | CZ | Lapse: 14.04.2021 | DE | | DK | | EE | Lapse: 14.04.2021 | ES | | FI | | FR | | GB | | GR | Lapse: 15.07.2021 | HR | Lapse: 14.04.2021 | HU | Lapse: 22.01.2019 | IE | | IS | Lapse: 14.08.2021 | IT | Lapse: 14.04.2021 | LI | | LT | Lapse: 14.04.2021 | LU | | LV | Lapse: 14.04.2021 | MC | Lapse: 14.04.2021 | MK | Lapse: 14.04.2021 | MT | | NL | | NO | | PL | Lapse: 14.04.2021 | PT | | RO | Lapse: 14.04.2021 | RS | Lapse: 14.04.2021 | SE | | SI | Lapse: 14.04.2021 | SK | Lapse: 14.04.2021 | SM | Lapse: 14.04.2021 | TR | | Examination procedure | 05.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | European patent granted | 14.04.2021 | Opposition procedure | 06.03.2024 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | | Appeal following opposition | 03.05.2024 | APPEAL FILED | 03.05.2024 | DATE PAYMENT APPEAL FEE | 08.07.2024 | APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED | 06.05.2024 | APPEAL FILED | 06.05.2024 | DATE PAYMENT APPEAL FEE | 06.07.2024 | APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED | 25.04.2024 | APPEAL FILED | 25.04.2024 | DATE PAYMENT APPEAL FEE | 05.07.2024 | APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED | 19.04.2024 | APPEAL FILED | 19.04.2024 | DATE PAYMENT APPEAL FEE | 03.07.2024 | APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED | 06.03.2024 | APPEAL FILED | 06.03.2024 | DATE PAYMENT APPEAL FEE | 04.04.2024 | APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 29.07.2020 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | BA ME | | Event date: | 29.07.2020 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | | Event date: | 07.10.2020 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED) | Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | | Event date: | 07.10.2020 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20200902 | | Event date: | 13.12.2020 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 13.01.2021 | | Event description: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20201214 | | Event date: | 29.01.2021 | | Event description: | INFORMATION RELATED TO DISAPPROVAL OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT BY THE APPLICANT OR RESUMPTION OF EXAMINATION PROCEEDINGS BY THE EPO DELETED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSDIGR1 | | Event date: | 12.02.2021 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 18.02.2021 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 10.03.2021 | | Event description: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED (DELETED) | | Event date: | 12.03.2021 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 17.03.2021 | | Event description: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20210219 | | Event date: | 14.04.2021 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | | Event date: | 14.04.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | Free Format Text: | NOT ENGLISH | | Event date: | 15.04.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Event date: | 06.05.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 502019001190 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | | Event date: | 15.05.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT REF 1381449 AT T | Code Expl.: | +REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA) | Effective DATE: | 20210515 | | Event date: | 12.05.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | Free Format Text: | LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN | | Event date: | 14.05.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT SC4A 3685673 PT 20210514 T | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE | Free Format Text: | AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION | Effective DATE: | 20210507 | | Event date: | 12.07.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK T3 | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS | Effective DATE: | 20210706 | | Event date: | 21.07.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL FP | Code Expl.: | TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY) | | Event date: | 27.07.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE TRGR | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT | | Event date: | 26.06.2020 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 12.03.2021 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE PATENT HAS BEEN GRANTED | | Event date: | 12.02.2021 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED | | Event date: | 29.01.2021 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE | | Event date: | 13.12.2020 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED | | Event date: | 04.09.2020 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE | | Event date: | 26.06.2020 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE APPLICATION HAS BEEN PUBLISHED | | Event date: | 10.08.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LT MG9D | Code Expl.: | -INVALIDATION OF EXTENSION OF EUROPEAN PATENTS | | Event date: | 04.08.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R026 502019001190 DE | Code Expl.: | -OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT | | Event date: | 07.07.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FI FGE | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALIDATED IN FINLAND | | Event date: | 08.09.2021 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | CHOCOLADEFABRIKEN LINDT & SPRUENGLI GMBH | Effective DATE: | 20210804 | | Event date: | 20.09.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NO T2 | Code Expl.: | +ENTRY OF EP PATENT INTO NATIONAL PHASE OF NORWAY [PUBL. OF TRANSLATION] | Effective DATE: | 20210414 | | Event date: | 07.09.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FI MDE | Code Expl.: | OPPOSITION FILED IN FINLAND | OPPONENT: | CHOCOLADEFABRIKEN LINDT & SPRUENGLI GMBH | | Event date: | 29.10.2021 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20210714 | | Event date: | 29.10.2021 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20210414 | | Event date: | 29.10.2021 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20210414 | | Event date: | 03.11.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2872929 ES T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20211103 | | Event date: | 06.08.2021 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | | Event date: | 30.11.2021 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RS | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20210414 | | Event date: | 30.11.2021 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20210414 | | Event date: | 30.11.2021 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LV | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20210414 | | Event date: | 30.11.2021 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20210715 | | Event date: | 30.11.2021 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IS | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20210814 | | Event date: | 14.01.2022 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | | Event date: | 21.01.2022 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | | Event date: | 25.01.2022 | | Event description: | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2 | | Event date: | 31.01.2022 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20210414 | | Event date: | 31.01.2022 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SM | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20210414 | | Event date: | 31.01.2022 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20210414 | | Event date: | 31.01.2022 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20210414 | | Event date: | 31.01.2022 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20210414 | | Event date: | 16.02.2022 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | COOP GENOSSENSCHAFT | Effective DATE: | 20220112 | | Event date: | 16.02.2022 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | BARRY CALLEBAUT AG | Effective DATE: | 20220113 | | Event date: | 16.02.2022 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. | Effective DATE: | 20220113 | | Event date: | 23.02.2022 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | CASA LUKER S.A. | Effective DATE: | 20220114 | | Event date: | 15.02.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FI MDE | Code Expl.: | OPPOSITION FILED IN FINLAND | OPPONENT: | CHOCOLADEFABRIKEN LINDT & SPRUENGLI GMBH | | Event date: | 15.02.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FI MDE | Code Expl.: | OPPOSITION FILED IN FINLAND | OPPONENT: | COOP GENOSSENSCHAFT | | Event date: | 15.02.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FI MDE | Code Expl.: | OPPOSITION FILED IN FINLAND | OPPONENT: | BARRY CALLEBAUT AG | | Event date: | 15.02.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FI MDE | Code Expl.: | OPPOSITION FILED IN FINLAND | OPPONENT: | SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. | | Event date: | 15.02.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FI MDE | Code Expl.: | OPPOSITION FILED IN FINLAND | OPPONENT: | CASA LUKER S.A. | | Event date: | 22.02.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FI MDE | Code Expl.: | OPPOSITION FILED IN FINLAND | OPPONENT: | CHOCOLADEFABRIKEN LINDT & SPRUENGLI GMBH | | Event date: | 22.02.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FI MDE | Code Expl.: | OPPOSITION FILED IN FINLAND | OPPONENT: | COOP GENOSSENSCHAFT | | Event date: | 22.02.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FI MDE | Code Expl.: | OPPOSITION FILED IN FINLAND | OPPONENT: | BARRY CALLEBAUT AG | | Event date: | 22.02.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FI MDE | Code Expl.: | OPPOSITION FILED IN FINLAND | OPPONENT: | SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. | | Event date: | 22.02.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FI MDE | Code Expl.: | OPPOSITION FILED IN FINLAND | OPPONENT: | CASA LUKER S.A. | | Event date: | 20.05.2022 | | Event description: | INFORMATION MODIFIED RELATED TO COMMUNICATION OF A NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATIONS + TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSCOBS2 | | Event date: | 01.06.2022 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20210414 | | Event date: | 29.07.2022 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20210414 | | Event date: | 05.08.2022 | | Event description: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION RECEIVED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS3 | | Event date: | 01.06.2022 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IS | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20210814 | | Event date: | 31.08.2022 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20210414 | | Event date: | 21.06.2023 | | Event description: | OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED | Effective DATE: | 20230512 | | Event date: | 07.07.2023 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO | | Event date: | 09.08.2023 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED) | OPPONENT: | SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. | Effective DATE: | 20220113 | | Event date: | 19.01.2024 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO | | Event date: | 31.01.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Payment DATE: | 20231215 | Year of Fee Payment: | 06 | | Event date: | 21.02.2024 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED) | OPPONENT: | CASA LUKER S.A. | Effective DATE: | 20220114 | | Event date: | 01.03.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Payment DATE: | 20240124 | Year of Fee Payment: | 06 | | Event date: | 29.02.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20240126 | Year of Fee Payment: | 06 | | Event date: | 05.03.2024 | | Event description: | COMMUNICATION DESPATCHED THAT OPPOSITION WAS REJECTED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNREJ1 | | Event date: | 08.03.2024 | | Event description: | APPEAL REFERENCE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSCREFNO | | Event date: | 08.03.2024 | | Event description: | APPEAL REFERENCE RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNREFNO | | Event date: | 08.03.2024 | | Event description: | DATE OF RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF APPEAL RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA2O | | Event date: | 05.04.2024 | | Event description: | DATE OF RECEIPT OF STATEMENT OF GROUNDS OF APPEAL RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA3O | | Event date: | 16.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Payment DATE: | 20240124 | Year of Fee Payment: | 06 | | Event date: | 16.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20240201 | Year of Fee Payment: | 06 | | Event date: | 20.04.2024 | | Event description: | APPEAL REFERENCE RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNREFNO | | Event date: | 20.04.2024 | | Event description: | DATE OF RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF APPEAL RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA2O | | Event date: | 23.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20240124 | Year of Fee Payment: | 06 | | Event date: | 27.04.2024 | | Event description: | APPEAL REFERENCE RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNREFNO | | Event date: | 27.04.2024 | | Event description: | DATE OF RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF APPEAL RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA2O | | Event date: | 30.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20240202 | Year of Fee Payment: | 06 | | Event date: | 30.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20240124 | Year of Fee Payment: | 06 | | Event date: | 30.04.2024 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20210414 | | Event date: | 30.04.2024 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20210414 | | Event date: | 30.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20240201 | Year of Fee Payment: | 06 | | Event date: | 30.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Payment DATE: | 20240126 | Year of Fee Payment: | 06 | | Event date: | 06.05.2024 | | Event description: | APPEAL REFERENCE RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNREFNO | | Event date: | 06.05.2024 | | Event description: | DATE OF RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF APPEAL RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA2O | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT; INVALID AB INITIO | Effective DATE: | 20190122 | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20240124 | Year of Fee Payment: | 06 | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Payment DATE: | 20240124 | Year of Fee Payment: | 06 | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20240126 | Year of Fee Payment: | 06 | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NO | Payment DATE: | 20240129 | Year of Fee Payment: | 06 | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20240125 | Year of Fee Payment: | 06 | | Event date: | 04.07.2024 | | Event description: | DATE OF RECEIPT OF STATEMENT OF GROUNDS OF APPEAL RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA3O | | Event date: | 06.07.2024 | | Event description: | DATE OF RECEIPT OF STATEMENT OF GROUNDS OF APPEAL RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA3O | | Event date: | 08.07.2024 | | Event description: | DATE OF RECEIPT OF STATEMENT OF GROUNDS OF APPEAL RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA3O | | Event date: | 09.07.2024 | | Event description: | DATE OF RECEIPT OF STATEMENT OF GROUNDS OF APPEAL RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA3O | |