EP3685673 - VEGAN CHOCOLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2024 | New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Katjes Fassin GmbH. + Co. Kommanditgesellschaft Dechant-Sprünken-Strasse 53 - 57 46446 Emmerich / DE | [2020/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACHMÜLLER, Tobias c/o Katjes Fassin GmbH + Co. KG Dechant-Sprünken-Str. 53-57 46446 Emmerich am Rhein / DE | 02 /
BOEKHAUS, Detlev c/o Ludwig Weinrich GmbH & Co. KG Diebrocker Straße 17 32051 Herford / DE | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/15] | Herzog IP Patentanwalts GmbH Steinstraße 16-18 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2020/31] | Herzog IP Patentanwalts GmbH Immermannstraße 40 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 19153064.1 | 22.01.2019 | [2020/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3685673 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3685673 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A23G1/00, A23G1/32 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
A23G1/32 (EP);
A23G1/0026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] |
Former [2020/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VEGANE SCHOKOLADE | [2020/31] | English: | VEGAN CHOCOLATE | [2020/31] | French: | CHOCOLAT VÉGÉTAL INTÉGRAL | [2020/31] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 02.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.08.2021
14.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Chocoladefabriken Lindt & Sprüngli GmbH Süsterfeldstrasse 130 52072 Aachen / DE Opponent's representative Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | 02
12.01.2022
14.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Coop Genossenschaft Thiersteinerallee 12 4053 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Ciesla, Ulrike MLL Legal AG Schiffbaustrasse 2 8005 Zürich / CH | 03
13.01.2022
14.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Barry Callebaut AG Hardturmstrasse 181 8005 Zürich / CH Opponent's representative Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | 04
13.01.2022
14.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Entre-deux-Villes 1800 Vevey / CH Opponent's representative Slaven, John William Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | 05
14.01.2022
18.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Casa Luker S.A. Calle 13 68-98 Bogota / CO Opponent's representative Latzel, Klaus LATZEL-IP Traunstraße 3 81825 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.08.2021
14.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Chocoladefabriken Lindt & Sprüngli GmbH Süsterfeldstrasse 130 52072 Aachen / DE Opponent's representative Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
02
12.01.2022
14.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Coop Genossenschaft Thiersteinerallee 12 4053 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Ciesla, Ulrike Meyerlustenberger Lachenal Froriep AG Schiffbaustrasse 2 8031 Zürich / CH | |||
03
13.01.2022
14.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Barry Callebaut AG Hardturmstrasse 181 8005 Zürich / CH Opponent's representative Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | |||
04
13.01.2022
14.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Entre-deux-Villes 1800 Vevey / CH Opponent's representative Slaven, John William Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | |||
05
14.01.2022
18.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Casa Luker S.A. Calle 13 68-98 Bogota / CO Opponent's representative Latzel, Klaus LATZEL-IP Traunstraße 3 81825 München / DE | |||
Former [2023/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.08.2021
14.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Chocoladefabriken Lindt & Sprüngli GmbH Süsterfeldstrasse 130 52072 Aachen / DE Opponent's representative Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
02
12.01.2022
14.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Coop Genossenschaft Thiersteinerallee 12 4053 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Ciesla, Ulrike Meyerlustenberger Lachenal Froriep AG Schiffbaustrasse 2 8031 Zürich / CH | |||
03
13.01.2022
14.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Barry Callebaut AG Hardturmstrasse 181 8005 Zürich / CH Opponent's representative Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | |||
04
13.01.2022
14.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Entre-deux-Villes 1800 Vevey / CH Opponent's representative Slaven, John William Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | |||
05
14.01.2022
18.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Casa Luker S.A. Calle 13 68-98 Bogota / CO Opponent's representative Tribalyte Ideas Gta. Quevedo 8, 6°2 28015 Madrid / ES | |||
Former [2022/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.08.2021
14.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Chocoladefabriken Lindt & Sprüngli GmbH Süsterfeldstrasse 130 52072 Aachen / DE Opponent's representative Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
02
12.01.2022
14.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Coop Genossenschaft Thiersteinerallee 12 4053 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Ciesla, Ulrike Meyerlustenberger Lachenal Froriep AG Schiffbaustrasse 2 8031 Zürich / CH | |||
03
13.01.2022
14.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Barry Callebaut AG Hardturmstrasse 181 8005 Zurich / CH Opponent's representative Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | |||
04
13.01.2022
14.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Entre-deux-Villes 1800 Vevey / CH Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | |||
05
14.01.2022
18.01.2022
ADMISSIBLE Casa Luker S.A. Calle 13 68-98 Bogota / CO Opponent's representative Tribalyte Ideas Gta. Quevedo 8, 6°2 28015 Madrid / ES | |||
Former [2022/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.08.2021
Chocoladefabriken Lindt & Sprüngli GmbH Süsterfeldstrasse 130 52072 Aachen / DE Opponent's representative Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
02
12.01.2022
Coop Genossenschaft Thiersteinerallee 12 4053 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Ciesla, Ulrike Meyerlustenberger Lachenal Froriep AG Schiffbaustrasse 2 8031 Zürich / CH | |||
03
13.01.2022
Barry Callebaut AG Hardturmstrasse 181 8005 Zurich / CH Opponent's representative Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | |||
04
13.01.2022
Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Entre-deux-Villes 1800 Vevey / CH Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | |||
Former [2021/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.08.2021
Chocoladefabriken Lindt & Sprüngli GmbH Süsterfeldstrasse 130 52072 Aachen / DE Opponent's representative Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 26.01.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.08.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.01.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.03.2024 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.03.2024 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Appeal following opposition | 03.05.2024 | Appeal received No. T0373/24 | 03.05.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 08.07.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.05.2024 | Appeal received No. T0373/24 | 06.05.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 06.07.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.04.2024 | Appeal received No. T0373/24 | 25.04.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 05.07.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.04.2024 | Appeal received No. T0373/24 | 19.04.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 03.07.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.03.2024 | Appeal received No. T0373/24 | 06.03.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 04.04.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.03.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.01.2019 | AL | 14.04.2021 | CY | 14.04.2021 | CZ | 14.04.2021 | EE | 14.04.2021 | HR | 14.04.2021 | IT | 14.04.2021 | LT | 14.04.2021 | LV | 14.04.2021 | MC | 14.04.2021 | MK | 14.04.2021 | PL | 14.04.2021 | RO | 14.04.2021 | RS | 14.04.2021 | SI | 14.04.2021 | SK | 14.04.2021 | SM | 14.04.2021 | BG | 14.07.2021 | GR | 15.07.2021 | IS | 14.08.2021 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
CY | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
MK | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
CY | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 14.04.2021 | |
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 14.04.2021 | |
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 14.04.2021 | |
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | HR | 14.04.2021 | |
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | HR | 14.04.2021 | |
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | HR | 14.04.2021 | |
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | HR | 14.04.2021 | |
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | LT | 14.04.2021 | |
BG | 14.07.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0634106 (QUAKER OATS CO [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]US2013259973 (VALDEZ MONICA [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * example 6 *; | [I]CN104171220 (YANGJIANG STRONG JELLY MFG CO LTD) [I] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]CN107114685 (JIAOZUO RONGLIDA FOOD CO LTD) [I] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]CN109090314 (QUANZHOU YUANCHUANG ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION TECH CO LTD) [I] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | WO8908405 | EP2842430 | - KLEIN; RAABE; WEISS, Textsammlung Lebensmittelrecht, Behr's Verlag GmbH & Co., (20160600), vol. 1 - 5 | - ÖLEN; FETTEN; KLEIN; RAABE; WEISS, Textsammlung Lebensmittelrecht, Behr's Verlag GmbH & Co., (20160600), vol. 1 - 5 | Opposition | EP0744131 | US6451369 | WO2008025803 | US2008260909 | US2013251850 | US2014193564 | CN106260376 | AU2017101745 | WO8908405 | US2002018830 | WO2010053653 | EP2842430 | WO2018167788 | US4619831 | US2002081367 | WO2010023351 | WO9316606 | US2005175765 | WO2012076601 | US2016081375 | WO9100027 | US2006134308 | WO2007100766 | WO2012076575 | WO2012076058 | JP2013051898 | CN109090314 | PL232965B | - Compilations of articles in the Agricultural Research magazine, (20120000), pages 1 - 21 | - Pray Leslie, Et Al, "Leveraging Food Technology for Obesity prevention and Reduction Efforts", (20110101), pages 36 - 37, XP055887152 | - Caetano Da Silva Lannes S, Et Al, "Chapter 6: Low-Fat Foods", Food Production and Industry, (20150101), pages 167 - 185, XP055887149 | - Lee Suyong, Et Al, "Effect of cocoa butter replacement with a b-glucan-rich hydrocolloid (C-trim30) on the rheological and tribological properties of chocolates", J Sci Food Agric, (20080101), vol. 89, pages 163 - 167, XP055887141 | - Inglett G E, Et Al, "Evaluation of hydrolyzed oat flour as a replacement for butter and coconut cream in bakery products", Food Science and Technology Int., (20000101), vol. 6, no. 6, pages 457 - 462, XP055887138 | - Kim Sanghoon, Inglett George E., Liu Sean X., "Content and Molecular Weight Distribution of Oat β‐Glucan in Oatrim, Nutrim, and C‐Trim Products", CEREAL CHEMISTRY, AACC International Inc., US, US , (20080901), vol. 85, no. 5, doi:10.1094/CCHEM-85-5-0701, ISSN 0009-0352, pages 701 - 705, XP093134264 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1094/CCHEM-85-5-0701 | - Kivelä Reetta, "NON-ENZYMATIC DEGRADATION OF (1→3)(1→4)-β-D-GLUCAN IN AQUEOUS PROCESSING OF OATS", Academic Dissertation University of Helsinki, (20110601), ISSN 0355-1180, pages 1 - 78, XP093134267 | - "MOLDA launches Florentine Mix with low melting point at Fi Europe | FDBusiness.com", (20111004), URL: https://www.fdbusiness.com/molda-launches-florentine-mix-with-low-melting-point-at-fi-europe/, XP093134271 | - "Aventia: An oat extract for lactose free products ", MOLDA Press Release, (20111129), XP093134273 | - Macarthur L.A., D'appolonia B.L., "Comparison of Oat and Wheat Carbohydrates. 1. Sugars", Cereal Chem., (19790101), vol. 56, no. 5, pages 455 - 457, XP093134268 | - Macarthur L.A., D'appolonia, "Comparison of Oat and Wheat Carbohydrates. II. Starch", Cereal Chem., (19790101), vol. 56, no. 5, pages 458 - 461, XP093134269 | - "Industrial Enzymes - Structure, Function and Applications. Excerpts", Polaina Julio (ed.), Et Al, Industrial Enzymes, Springer , (20070101), pages 1 - 35, ISBN 978-1-4020-5376-4, XP055887635 | - NADIA MURRAY-RAGG, "Goodio ‘ChocOat’ Vegan Oat Milk Chocolate Bars to Debut in U.S.", Livekindly, (20180605), URL: https://www.livekindly.co/goodio-chocoat-vegan-oat-milk-chocolate-bars-to-debut-in-u-s/, XP055897980 | - Beckett S. T., "Table 18.9 Milk Chocolate recipes", Industrial Chocolate Manufacture and use. 3rd ed., (19990101), page 342, XP055897982 | - Aidoo Herta, Sakyi-Dawson Esther, Abbey Lawrence, Tano-Debrah Kwaku, Saalia Firibu Kwesi, "Optimisation of chocolate formulation using dehydrated peanut-cowpea milk to replace dairy milk : Chocolate formulation with vegetable milk", JOURNAL OF THE SCIENCE OF FOOD AND AGRICULTURE, WILEY & SONS, CHICHESTER., GB, GB , (20120130), vol. 92, no. 2, doi:10.1002/jsfa.4563, ISSN 0022-5142, pages 224 - 231, XP055897977 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jsfa.4563 | - Anonymous, "Oat beta-glucan", Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia, (20190124), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Oat_beta-glucan, XP055897975 | - Xingxun Liu, Yanfei Wang, Long Yu, Zhen Tong, Ling Chen, Hongsheng Liu, Xiaoxi Li, "Thermal degradation and stability of starch under different processing conditions", Starch, Wiley Subscription Services, Inc, Weinheim, Weinheim , doi:10.1002/star.201200198, (20130101), page 48, Starch, URL: http://search.proquest.com/docview/1346193907, XP055117576 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/star.201200198 | - Dominic W. S. Wong, George H. Robertson, "CHAPTER 56 Alpha -Amylases", Dominic W. S. Wong, George H. Robertson, John R. Whitaker et.al., Handbook of Food Enzymology, US, Dekker, (20021205), pages 707 - 718, doi:10.1201/9780203910450, ISBN 0-8247-0686-2, XP009552645 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1201/9780203910450 | - Peter J. Reilly, "Glucoamylase", Peter J. Reilly, John R. Whitaker et.al., Handbook of Food Enzymology, US, Dekker, (20021205), pages 727 - 738, doi:10.1201/9780203910450, ISBN 0-8247-0686-2, XP009552646 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1201/9780203910450 | - Robert W. Welch, "Chapter 6: Nutrient Composition and Nutritional Quality of Oats and Comparisons with Other Cereals", OATS: Chemistry and Technology, Second Edition, (20110101), pages 95 - 107, doi:10.1094/9781891127649.006, ISBN 978-1-891127-64-9, XP009552647 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1094/9781891127649.006 | - Sedat Sayar, Pamela J. White, "Chapter 7: Oat Starch: Physiochemical Properties and Function", Sedat Sayar, Pamela J. White, Francis H. Webster, OATS: Chemistry and Technology, Second Edition, (20110101), pages 109 - 122, doi:10.1094/9781891127649.007, ISBN 978-1-891127-64-9, XP009552648 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1094/9781891127649.007 | - Anonymous, "Lehrerinformation zur Katalyse ", Vorschriften und Informationen über die Versuche, Agnes-Pockels-Schülerinnen Labor; Technische Universität Braunschweig, (20181214), pages 1 - 15, Vorschriften und Informationen über die Versuche, URL: https://www.tu-braunschweig.de/index.php?eID=dumpFile&t=f&f=90860&token=8ebe59c0c09348ad1280962c5749f629416e889a, (20240319), XP093143074 |