EP3528265 - MAGNETIC COMPONENT, CONVERTER AND INDUCTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delta Electronics (Shanghai) Co., Ltd. 1F&7F&8F, Building 1 No.1675 Huadong Road, Pudong 201209 Shanghai / CN | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Zengyi c/o Delta Electronics (Shanghai) CO., LTD 1F&7F&8F, Building 1 No.1675 Huadong Road, Pudong SHANGHAI, 201209 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Xinwei c/o Delta Electronics (Shanghai) CO., LTD 1F&7F&8F, Building 1 No.1675 Huadong Road, Pudong SHANGHAI, 201209 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Shiwei c/o Delta Electronics (Shanghai) CO., LTD 1F&7F&8F, Building 1 No.1675 Huadong Road, Pudong SHANGHAI, 201209 / CN | 04 /
GUO, Xingkuan c/o Delta Electronics (Shanghai) CO., LTD 1F&7F&8F, Building 1 No.1675 Huadong Road, Pudong SHANGHAI, 201209 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Jinfa c/o Delta Electronics (Shanghai) CO., LTD 1F&7F&8F, Building 1 No.1675 Huadong Road, Pudong SHANGHAI 201209 / CN | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2019/34] | Application number, filing date | 19153538.4 | 24.01.2019 | [2019/34] | Priority number, date | CN201810134988 | 09.02.2018 Original published format: CN201810134988 | [2019/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3528265 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01F3/14, H01F27/38, H01F30/12, H01F37/00, H02M3/28 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
H01F3/14 (EP,US);
H01F27/24 (CN,US);
H01F27/306 (CN,US);
H01F27/38 (EP,US);
H01F30/12 (EP,CN,US);
H01F37/00 (EP,CN,US);
H02M3/01 (EP,CN,US);
H02M3/33573 (EP,CN,US);
H01F27/346 (US);
H02M1/0043 (EP,CN,US);
H02M1/0058 (EP,US);
H02M3/24 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAGNETISCHE KOMPONENTE, WANDLER UND INDUKTOR | [2019/34] | English: | MAGNETIC COMPONENT, CONVERTER AND INDUCTOR | [2019/34] | French: | COMPOSANT MAGNÉTIQUE, CONVERTISSEUR ET INDUCTEUR | [2019/34] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 21.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6657529 (ALBACH MANFRED [DE]) [X] 1-3,10,11 * figure 3 * * column 4, line 1 - line 25 * [Y] 5-9; | [Y]US2013113596 (LI JIELI [US], et al) [Y] 6-8* abstract *; | [X]US2015200051 (UMETANI KAZUHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-4,10 * figures 6,7 * * paragraph [0116] - paragraph [0161] *; | [Y]US2017011830 (LU ZENGYI [CN], et al) [Y] 5,9 * figures 5,6 * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] *; | [XP]EP3401935 (DELTA ELECTRONICS THAILAND PUBLIC CO LTD [TH]) [XP] 1,10-18 * paragraph [0141]; figures 13,14,15 * * paragraph [0181] - paragraph [0195] * |