13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
06.05.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
26.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] |
12.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
29.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] |
18.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
08.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] |
24.09.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
10.09.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.10.2021 [2021/41] |
03.09.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
30.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
11.06.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] |
21.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
07.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
23.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
02.10.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] |
28.09.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
28.09.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
25.09.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
07.08.2020 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
15.07.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
25.05.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.02.2020 |
Change - applicant |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
03.02.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.01.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
17.01.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
17.01.2020 |
Change - designated states |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
23.08.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
07.06.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] |
28.05.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.01.2019 |
Change - representative |
|